Gonzalez v. Securites Security Inc
Plaintiff: Eddien Enrique Gonzalez
Defendant: Securites Security Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv03946
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:The 6/24/2019 notice motion date is stricken.Mailed notice (srn, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Eddien Gonzalez has filed a complaint alleging his constitutional rights were violated. The Court cannot understand what Mr. Gonzalez alleges happened to him from what he wrote in his complaint. Therefore, his complaint is dismissed without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) for failure to state a claim. Since the complaint is dismissed without prejudice, Mr. Gonzalez may file an amended complaint if he is able to clearly explain to the Court what happened to him. If Mr. Gonzalez wants to file an amended complaint he must do so by July 19, 2019. If he does not file an amended complaint by July 19, 2019, his case will be dismissed with prejudice, at which point his case will be over. For assistance in proceeding with this case, Mr. Gonzalez may make an appointment with the District Courts Pro Se Assistance Program online at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Pages.aspx?page=ProSe or by calling (312) 435-5691.Mailed notice (srn, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion by Eddien Enrique Gonzalez for presentment of before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/24/2019 at 09:00 AM. (ek, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Eddien Enrique Gonzalez (ek, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ek, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Eddien Enrique Gonzalez. (ek, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Securites Security Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securites Security Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddien Enrique Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?