McDowell et al v. BNY Mellon et al
Plaintiff: Defined Benefits Trustee Plan 403b, JC McDowel, Self Insurance Patent Portfolio Mgmt, BMMGVC Magistrate Brokerage Law Group MLP LTD and JC McDowell
Defendant: BNY Mellon and Wells Fargo
Case Number: 1:2019cv03997
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 CIRCUIT Rule 3(b) Fee Notice (jjr, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #12 ; USCA Case No. 19-2539 (jjr, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #12 . Notified counsel (lma, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #12 (lma, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of appeal by JC McDowell regarding orders #11 . (Exhibits). (lma, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice, as it is not meaningfully different from his original Complaint. As explained in the Court's June 24, 2019 Order #7 , the Court must dismiss a complaint that is frivolous and fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Civil case terminated. Mailed notice(maf)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 LETTERS ROGATORY @ Filing Fee by JC McDowell. (gcy, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Amended Complaint and by JC McDowell. (gcy, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: McDowell's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied, and his Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. McDowell has 30 days to file an Amended Complaint that states a claim upon which relief can be granted, or else this matter will be dismissed with prejudice. This case remains open. Mailed notice(maf)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff JC McDowell's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. No. 3) is denied and Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/24/2019: Mailed notice(maf)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff JC McDowel (jjr, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff JC McDowel for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jjr, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (jjr, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 2 copies by JC McDowel (jjr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDowell et al v. BNY Mellon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defined Benefits Trustee Plan 403b
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JC McDowel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Self Insurance Patent Portfolio Mgmt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMMGVC Magistrate Brokerage Law Group MLP LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JC McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNY Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?