Mack v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Kiontae Mack
Defendant: Sgt. Hoover, P.O. Robinson, K. Williams, City of Chicago, P.O. Ray, David Roberts, P.O. Jackson, Paul Maderer, W. Davis and P.O. Barnes
Case Number: 1:2019cv04001
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kiontae Mack by Christopher W Carmichael (Carmichael, Christopher)
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #17 is granted to and including 8/16/19. Motion hearing date of 7/23/19 is stricken. Status hearing set for 8/19/19 is stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 16 on 9/5/19 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report. The form is accessible from the courts Internet site, https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_judges/pallmeyer/Report% 20of%20Planning%20Mtg.pdf. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony James Masciopinto for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #17 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/23/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Masciopinto, Anthony)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendants P.O. Barnes, City of Chicago, W. Davis, Sgt. Hoover, P.O. Jackson, Paul Maderer, P.O. Ray, David Roberts, P.O. Robinson, K. Williams for extension of time to file answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Masciopinto, Anthony)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants P.O. Barnes, W. Davis, Sgt. Hoover, P.O. Jackson, Paul Maderer, P.O. Ray, David Roberts, P.O. Robinson, K. Williams by Heather Kathreen Afra (Afra, Heather)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants P.O. Barnes, W. Davis, Sgt. Hoover, P.O. Jackson, Paul Maderer, P.O. Ray, David Roberts, P.O. Robinson, K. Williams by Anthony James Masciopinto (Masciopinto, Anthony)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Caroline Jane Fronczak (Fronczak, Caroline)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kiontae Mack as to W. Davis on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Schoop, Devlin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kiontae Mack as to P.O. Ray on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Schoop, Devlin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kiontae Mack as to P.O. Jackson on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Schoop, Devlin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kiontae Mack as to Paul Maderer on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Schoop, Devlin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kiontae Mack as to Sgt. Hoover on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Schoop, Devlin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kiontae Mack as to P.O. Robinson on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Schoop, Devlin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kiontae Mack as to P.O. Barnes on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Schoop, Devlin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kiontae Mack as to K. Williams on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Schoop, Devlin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kiontae Mack as to David Roberts on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Schoop, Devlin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kiontae Mack as to City of Chicago on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Schoop, Devlin)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 8/19/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kiontae Mack by Devlin Joseph Schoop (Schoop, Devlin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kiontae Mack; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schoop, Devlin) Filing fee $400, receipt number 0752-15930356. Docket text modified by Clerk's Office on 6/14/2019 (mma, )
June 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Hoover
Represented By: Heather Kathreen Afra
Represented By: Anthony James Masciopinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Robinson
Represented By: Heather Kathreen Afra
Represented By: Anthony James Masciopinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Williams
Represented By: Heather Kathreen Afra
Represented By: Anthony James Masciopinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Represented By: Caroline Jane Fronczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Ray
Represented By: Heather Kathreen Afra
Represented By: Anthony James Masciopinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Roberts
Represented By: Heather Kathreen Afra
Represented By: Anthony James Masciopinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Jackson
Represented By: Heather Kathreen Afra
Represented By: Anthony James Masciopinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Maderer
Represented By: Heather Kathreen Afra
Represented By: Anthony James Masciopinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Davis
Represented By: Heather Kathreen Afra
Represented By: Anthony James Masciopinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Barnes
Represented By: Heather Kathreen Afra
Represented By: Anthony James Masciopinto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiontae Mack
Represented By: Devlin Joseph Schoop
Represented By: Christopher W Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?