Delgado v. MNET Financial, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jose Delgado
Defendant: MNET Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04013
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The briefing schedule on defendant's motion to dismiss #14 is as follows: plaintiff's response is due 8/19/19; defendant's reply is due 9/3/19. No appearance on 7/31/19 is necessary. Status hearing remains set for 9/6/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Robbie Malone for presentment of motion to dismiss #14 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/31/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Malone, Robbie)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant MNET Financial, Inc. to dismiss (Malone, Robbie)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MNET Financial, Inc. by Patrick Allen Watts (Watts, Patrick)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time #7 is granted. Defendant must respond to the complaint by 7/25/19. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Status hearing remains set for 9/6/19 at 9:30 a.m., with a joint initial status report due three days prior. Notices mailed. (psm, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MNET Financial, Inc. by Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV (Martin, Eugene)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MNET Financial, Inc. by Cooper Morgan Walker (Walker, Cooper)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Robbie Malone for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #7 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/11/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Malone, Robbie)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MNET Financial, Inc. by Robbie Malone (Malone, Robbie)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant MNET Financial, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply of Pleading (Malone, Robbie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Delgado as to MNET Financial, Inc. on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Chatman, Celetha)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 9/6/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 19, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant MNET Financial, Inc. (ecw, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
June 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jose Delgado by Celetha Chatman (Chatman, Celetha)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jose Delgado by Michael Jacob Wood (Wood, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jose Delgado; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15931908. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado v. MNET Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MNET Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Robbie Malone
Represented By: Cooper Morgan Walker
Represented By: Patrick Allen Watts
Represented By: Eugene Xerxes Martin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Delgado
Represented By: Michael Jacob Wood
Represented By: Celetha Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?