Enriquez v. Oliver Adjustment Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: MaryAngel Enriquez
Defendant: Oliver Adjustment Company, Inc. d/b/a OAC and Oliver Adjustment Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04017
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Given the notice of settlement #13 , the status hearing set for 8/1/2019 #5 is stricken and re-set for 9/12/2019 at 9:00 a.m. If dismissal papers are filed on or before 9/11/2019, the status hearing will be stricken and the case will be closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Settlement by MaryAngel Enriquez (Chatman, Celetha)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time to answer #10 is granted. The time for Defendant to respond to the complaint is extended to 7/30/2019. Motion hearing set for 7/24/2019 #11 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Katherine Maria Saldanha Olson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/24/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Saldanha Olson, Katherine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Oliver Adjustment Company, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (UNOPPOSED) (Saldanha Olson, Katherine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Oliver Adjustment Company, Inc. (Saldanha Olson, Katherine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oliver Adjustment Company, Inc. by Katherine Maria Saldanha Olson (Saldanha Olson, Katherine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Oliver Adjustment Company, Inc. by Nicole Marie Strickler (Strickler, Nicole)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MaryAngel Enriquez as to Oliver Adjustment Company, Inc. on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Chatman, Celetha)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 8/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 20, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Oliver Adjustment Company, Inc. (ec, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
June 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MaryAngel Enriquez by Celetha Chatman (Chatman, Celetha)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MaryAngel Enriquez by Michael Jacob Wood (Wood, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by MaryAngel Enriquez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15932633. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enriquez v. Oliver Adjustment Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MaryAngel Enriquez
Represented By: Michael Jacob Wood
Represented By: Celetha Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Adjustment Company, Inc. d/b/a OAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Adjustment Company, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Marie Strickler
Represented By: Katherine Maria Saldanha Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?