Eustis v. American Express Centurion Bank et al
Plaintiff: John Eustis
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, American Express Centurion Bank and American Express National Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv04053
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant American Express National Bank's unopposed motion for extension of time #13 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due by 8/23/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Erin Vaughn for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/30/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Vaughn, Erin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant American Express National Bank for extension of time to file answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Vaughn, Erin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by American Express National Bank Defendant American Express National Bank's Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Vaughn, Erin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Express National Bank by Erin Vaughn (Vaughn, Erin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC's agreed motion for an extension of time to file responsive pleading #8 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due 8/16/19. Motion presentment hearing set for 7/24/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (cn).
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 AGREED - NOTICE of Motion by Rodney L. Lewis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/24/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Lewis, Rodney)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC for extension of time to file answer - AGREED (Lewis, Rodney)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC by Rodney L. Lewis (Lewis, Rodney)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC by Mary Kathryn Curry (Curry, Mary)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Eustis as to Equifax Information Services LLC on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Eustis as to American Express Centurion Bank on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
June 27, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants American Express Centurion Bank, Equifax Information Services LLC (lma, )
June 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff John Eustis by Alexander John Mikulaschek (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John Eustis; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15936369. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Proof of Payments, #3 Exhibit Credit Report, #4 Exhibit Dispute Letter, #5 Exhibit Credit Report)(Mikulaschek, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eustis v. American Express Centurion Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Curry
Represented By: Rodney L. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Centurion Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express National Bank
Represented By: Erin Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Eustis
Represented By: Alexander John Mikulaschek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?