Davis v. Capital One Bank (U.S.A), N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Davis
Defendant: Capital One Bank (U.S.A), N.A., Experian Information Solutions Inc and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04059
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Davis (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time #9 is granted. Motion for extension of time #12 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, July 26, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher Adam Hall for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #12 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 7/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Hall, Christopher)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc for extension of time to file answer (UNOPPOSED) (Hall, Christopher)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc by Christopher Adam Hall (Hall, Christopher)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 AGREED - NOTICE of Motion by Rodney L. Lewis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 7/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Lewis, Rodney)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC for extension of time to file answer - AGREED (Lewis, Rodney)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC by Rodney L. Lewis (Lewis, Rodney)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC by Mary Kathryn Curry (Curry, Mary)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Davis as to Equifax Information Services LLC on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Davis as to Experian Information Solutions Inc on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Settlement by Kenneth Davis (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
June 27, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Capital One Bank (U.S.A), N.A., Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc (lma, )
June 18, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kenneth Davis by Alexander John Mikulaschek (Mikulaschek, Alexander)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth Davis; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15937396. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Credit Report, #3 Exhibit Dispute Letter, #4 Exhibit Credit Report)(Mikulaschek, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Capital One Bank (U.S.A), N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (U.S.A), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Christopher Adam Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Curry
Represented By: Rodney L. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Davis
Represented By: Alexander John Mikulaschek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?