Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe. subscriber assigned IP address 104.56.165.185
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe. subscriber assigned IP address 104.56.165.185
Case Number: 1:2019cv04084
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing set for 8/21/2019 is stricken and re-set to 9/10/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (mw, )
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/27/2019. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference #6 is granted without an appearance. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/15/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 8/21/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: #1 Copyright Information). (smm, )
June 18, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15940748. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe. subscriber assigned IP address 104.56.165.185
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe. subscriber assigned IP address 104.56.165.185
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?