Walker v. Board of Education of the City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Chimika Walker
Defendant: Board of Education of the City of Chicago, Legal Prep Charter Academies and Jamel M. Helaire-Jones
Case Number: 1:2019cv04115
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #13 is due by 9/4/2019; defendants' reply by 9/13/2019. Motion hearing date of 8/27/2019 is stricken. Status hearing set for 8/27/2019 is stricken and reset to 11/26/2019 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Randall W Slade for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 8/27/2019 at 11:00 AM. (Slade, Randall)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Legal Prep Charter Academies (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Slade, Randall)
August 7, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Jamel M. Helaire-Jones (mc, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Board of Education of the City of Chicago by Susan Jane Best (Best, Susan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Board of Education of the City of Chicago. Board of Education of the City of Chicago waiver sent on 6/19/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Kohls, Kathryn) (Text Modified by Clerk's Office). (smm, ).
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Board of Education of the City of Chicago by Kathryn E Kohls (Kohls, Kathryn)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Defendants' motion for extension of time #6 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 8/12/2019. Motion hearing set for 7/24/2019 is stricken. Status hearing remains set for 8/27/2019. Mailed notice (ags, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Legal Prep Charter Academies by Elizabeth L Casey (Casey, Elizabeth)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Randall W Slade for presentment of extension of time #6 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 7/24/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Slade, Randall)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant Legal Prep Charter Academies for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint (Slade, Randall)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Legal Prep Charter Academies by Randall W Slade (Slade, Randall)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Legal Prep Charter Academies by John J. Moroney, IV (Moroney, IV, John)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 8/27/2019 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
June 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff C.W., as Parent and Next Friend of Z.R., a Minor by James Charles Pullos (Pullos, James)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by C.W., as Parent and Next Friend of Z.R., a Minor; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15945387. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pullos, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Board of Education of the City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chimika Walker
Represented By: James Charles Pullos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of the City of Chicago
Represented By: Kathryn E Kohls
Represented By: Susan Jane Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Prep Charter Academies
Represented By: Randall W Slade
Represented By: John J. Moroney, IV
Represented By: Elizabeth L Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamel M. Helaire-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?