Marski v. Courier Express One, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Marski
Defendant: Premier CC LLC, a Qualtek Company, Dispatch Express Inc., Vertek LLC, PreCC, Inc., Courier Express One, Inc., Anthony Urso and Premier CC LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04132
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Courier Express One, Inc., Dispatch Express Inc., Anthony Urso, Vertek LLC by Barry Yale Freeman (Freeman, Barry)
August 7, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Oral motion to withdraw petition for admission #22 is granted and the motion is withdrawn. Motion hearing set for 8/8/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status and motion hearings held on 7/30/19. Defendants' joint motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #17 is granted. Any answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 8/23/2019. Notice date of 8/1/2019 is stricken. Case management conference set for 9/17/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Parties shall meet and confer regarding case management dates. Mailed notice. (cc, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Leslie Gregory Bleifuss for presentment of before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/8/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Bleifuss, Leslie)
July 25, 2019 Filing 22 PETITION for Admission to the General Bar for Barry Yale Freeman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Bleifuss, Leslie)
July 25, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Courier Express One, Inc., Dispatch Express Inc., Anthony Urso, Vertek LLC by Leslie Gregory Bleifuss (Bleifuss, Leslie)
July 25, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Courier Express One, Inc., Dispatch Express Inc., Anthony Urso, Vertek LLC by Michael A. O'Brien (O'Brien, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Premier CC LLC by Ashley Elizabeth Baxter (Baxter, Ashley)
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Jon D Hoag for presentment of extension of time #17 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/30/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Hoag, Jon)
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant PreCC, Inc. for extension of time (Hoag, Jon)
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Premier CC LLC by Ashley Elizabeth Baxter (Baxter, Ashley)
July 22, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Jon D Hoag for presentment of (Hoag, Jon)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Premier CC LLC by Marc Craig Smith (Smith, Marc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Premier CC LLC by Jonathan David Christman (Christman, Jonathan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Premier CC LLC by Colin D. Dougherty (Dougherty, Colin)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Michelle Marski. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Vucko, Stacey)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Michelle Marski regarding Amended Complaint, Summons, MIDP Standing Order, Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery served on PreCC, Inc., Dispatch Express Inc., Courier Express One, Inc., Anthony Urso on July 11, 2019 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Certificate of Service)(Vucko, Stacey)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Courier Express One, Inc., Dispatch Express Inc., PreCC, Inc., Anthony Urso, Vertek LLC by Nathaniel R Sinn (Sinn, Nathaniel)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Defer Responsive Pleading Deadline (MIDP) , filed by Defendant PreCC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion)(Hoag, Jon)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant PreCC, Inc. by Jon D Hoag (Hoag, Jon)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dispatch Express Inc., PreCC, Inc., Anthony Urso, Courier Express One, Inc., Vertek LLC. Dispatch Express Inc. waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019; PreCC, Inc. waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019; Anthony Urso waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019; Courier Express One, Inc. waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019; Vertek LLC waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Sinn, Nathaniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Michelle Marski. Premier CC LLC waiver sent on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Vucko, Stacey)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 8/1/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 7/22/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 24, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Courier Express One, Inc., Dispatch Express Inc., PreCC, Inc., Anthony Urso (rc, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED complaint by Michelle Marski against Courier Express One, Inc., Dispatch Express Inc., PreCC, Inc., Premier CC LLC, a Qualtek Company, Anthony Urso, Vertek LLC (Vucko, Stacey)
June 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michelle Marski; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15947806. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attorney Appearance)(Vucko, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marski v. Courier Express One, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier CC LLC, a Qualtek Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dispatch Express Inc.
Represented By: Leslie Gregory Bleifuss
Represented By: Barry Yale Freeman
Represented By: Michael A. O'Brien
Represented By: Nathaniel R Sinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vertek LLC
Represented By: Leslie Gregory Bleifuss
Represented By: Barry Yale Freeman
Represented By: Michael A. O'Brien
Represented By: Nathaniel R Sinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PreCC, Inc.
Represented By: Jon D Hoag
Represented By: Nathaniel R Sinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courier Express One, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie Gregory Bleifuss
Represented By: Barry Yale Freeman
Represented By: Michael A. O'Brien
Represented By: Nathaniel R Sinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Urso
Represented By: Leslie Gregory Bleifuss
Represented By: Barry Yale Freeman
Represented By: Michael A. O'Brien
Represented By: Nathaniel R Sinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier CC LLC
Represented By: Marc Craig Smith
Represented By: Jonathan David Christman
Represented By: Colin D. Dougherty
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Marski
Represented By: Stacey Blaire Vucko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?