Norfolk Southern Railway Company v. Piedmont Railway, LLC
Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Defendant: Piedmont Railway, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04144
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion hearing held and continued to 8/28/2019 at 9:30 a.m. If the matter is resolved prior to the next hearing date, the parties shall notify the courtroom deputy. Mailed notice (ags, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Hearing on the motion #6 is set for 7/31/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Norfolk Southern Railway Company to compel (Palombo, Eric)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norfolk Southern Railway Company by Eric C Palombo (Palombo, Eric)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion by Eric C Palombo for presentment of (Attachments: #1 Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Palombo, Eric)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Norfolk Southern Railway Company by Kevin P Lolli (Lolli, Kevin)
June 21, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (sxb, )
June 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Palombo, Eric)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment by Norfolk Southern Railway Company from Western District of North Carolina, Case Number 3:18-cv-268; Judgment for Norfolk Southern Railway Co. and against Piedmont Railway, LLC in the amount of $243560.16 entered on 12/20/2018. Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-15950190. (Palombo, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norfolk Southern Railway Company v. Piedmont Railway, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piedmont Railway, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Eric C Palombo
Represented By: Kevin P Lolli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?