Rivota v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michael A Rivota
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation and Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv04156
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc by Michael Ross Phillips (Phillips, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc [Defendants' Supplemental and Amended Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 Disclosure Statement] (Ni, Chen)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendants Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc. (Ni, Chen)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Michael A Rivota. (Ryan, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 16 Certification Regarding Discovery Obligations Under MIDP by Michael A Rivota (Ryan, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael A Rivota by Thomas Michael Ryan (Ryan, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 Certification regarding discovery obligations under MIDPP by Michael A Rivota (Bormes, James)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 Certification regarding discovery obligations under MIDPP by Michael A Rivota (Sons, Catherine)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 8/29/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael A Rivota by Catherine P. Sons (Sons, Catherine)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael A Rivota by James X. Bormes (Bormes, James)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Lennox, Katharine)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Ni, Chen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint [Class Action Complaint] by Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc(Ni, Chen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc by Katharine P. Lennox (Lennox, Katharine)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc by Chen George Ni (Ni, Chen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (cc, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel of record. (cc, )
June 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ni, Chen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019CH03625) filed by Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15951818. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Errata C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Ni, Chen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivota v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Katharine P. Lennox
Represented By: Chen George Ni
Represented By: Michael Ross Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc
Represented By: Katharine P. Lennox
Represented By: Chen George Ni
Represented By: Michael Ross Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Rivota
Represented By: Kasif Khowaja
Represented By: Catherine P. Sons
Represented By: Thomas Michael Ryan
Represented By: James X. Bormes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?