Rudman v. Board of Education for Township School District # 113 et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Rudman
Defendant: Ben Martindale, JM and KM, DM and EM, LL and AL, JB and MB, BS and MS, Linda Yonke, Board of Education for Township School District # 113, Thomas Krieger, TJ and MJ, John Does, JM, TJ, DM, LL and JB
Case Number: 1:2019cv04167
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED complaint by Stephen Rudman against All Defendants and terminating LL (individually and as parent of A.L.) and JM as parent of KM (Glink, Steven)
August 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Glink, Steven)
August 18, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED complaint by Stephen Rudman against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Glink, Steven)
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BS and MS by Christina Marie Tribbia (Tribbia, Christina)
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Rule 16(b) status hearing held with attorneys for all parties. Plaintiff is given until 8/21/2019 to file an amended complaint adding a party and dropping either parties. Responses to amended complaint are to be filed by 9/20/2019. Status hearing is set for 9/25/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TJ by Jacob Daniel Radecki (Radecki, Jacob)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DM by Darren K. Miller (Miller, Darren)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TJ by Stephen J. Rosenfeld (Rosenfeld, Stephen)
July 14, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 8/14/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal for certain parties only (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Glink, Steven)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LL by Stephen J. Rosenfeld (Rosenfeld, Stephen)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JM by Jason Brett Hirsh (Hirsh, Jason)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Board of Education for Township School District # 113, Thomas Krieger, Ben Martindale, Linda Yonke by Kevin Patrick Mckeown (Mckeown, Kevin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Board of Education for Township School District # 113, Thomas Krieger, Ben Martindale, Linda Yonke by Babak Bakhtiari (Bakhtiari, Babak)
June 21, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE (Glink, Steven)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Stephen Rudman by Steven Earl Glink (Glink, Steven)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Stephen Rudman; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15952631. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Glink, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rudman v. Board of Education for Township School District # 113 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Martindale
Represented By: Babak Bakhtiari
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mckeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JM and KM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DM and EM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LL and AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JB and MB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BS and MS
Represented By: Christina Marie Tribbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Yonke
Represented By: Babak Bakhtiari
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mckeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education for Township School District # 113
Represented By: Babak Bakhtiari
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mckeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Krieger
Represented By: Babak Bakhtiari
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Mckeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJ and MJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JM
Represented By: Jason Brett Hirsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJ
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Radecki
Represented By: Stephen J. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DM
Represented By: Darren K. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LL
Represented By: Stephen J. Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Rudman
Represented By: Steven Earl Glink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?