Haines v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Diane Haines
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv04202
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Initial status hearing held on 8/21/2019. Defendant's motion for summary judgment to be filed by 10/18/2019. Plaintiff's combined cross-motion and response to defendant's motion due by 11/15/2019. Defendant's reply in support of its motion and response to plaintiff's cross-motion due by 12/6/2019. Plaintiff's reply in support of its cross-motion due by 1/3/2020. The Court will rule by electronic notice. Mailed notice (is, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS Report INITIAL JOINT by Diane Haines (Casciari, Marie)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint , Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company(von Schleicher, W.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendant's unopposed motion for additional time to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint until 8/7/2019 #9 is granted. Motion hearing noticed for 7/23/2019 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (is, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (von Schleicher, W.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by W. Sebastian von Schleicher for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #9 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 7/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. (von Schleicher, W.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 , Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint (von Schleicher, W.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company by Rachel H. Beattie (Beattie, Rachel)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company by W. Sebastian von Schleicher (von Schleicher, W.)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diane Haines as to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company on 6/26/2019, answer due 7/17/2019. (Casciari, Marie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 8/21/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
June 24, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (rc, )
June 24, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Casciari, Marie)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Diane Haines by Martina B. Sherman (Sherman, Martina)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Diane Haines by Marie E. Casciari (Casciari, Marie)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Diane Haines; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15958112. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Casciari, Marie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haines v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Haines
Represented By: Martina B. Sherman
Represented By: Marie E. Casciari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Rachel H. Beattie
Represented By: W. Sebastian von Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?