Drake v. Caesars Entertainment
Appellant: Viola Drake
Appellee: Caesars Entertainment and Caesars Entertainment Operating Company, Inc.
Trustee: Patrick S. Layng
Case Number: 1:2019cv04203
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 MAIL RETURNED, for document #7 , #8 sent to Joshua Morse returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ph, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 MAIL RETURNED, for document #7 , #8 sent to Chris LeMastus Dickerson returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (ph, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 ENTERED JUDGMENT Signed by the Honorable Courtroom Deputy on 7/25/19.Mailed notice(ca, )
July 24, 2019 FINAL closing order dated 7/24/2019 entered on USBC docket. (sxb, )
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Appellant's motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal #6 is granted. Defendant's appeal is dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees on the appeal. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/24/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Appellant Viola Drake to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeal. (gcy, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Appellant's initial brief due is by 7/24/19. Appellee's response brief due by 8/14/19. Appellant's reply brief due by 9/4/19. Ruling to be by mail. Mailed notice (ca, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 MAILED Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letter to all counsel of record. (ph, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 letter to all counsel of record. (ph, )
June 24, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 15 B 1145 (Judge Goldgar) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Deficient Form)(USBC-Ross, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drake v. Caesars Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Viola Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Caesars Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Caesars Entertainment Operating Company, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Zott
Represented By: Marc Jason Carmel
Represented By: Judson Damron Brown
Represented By: Benjamin Rhode
Represented By: Jeffrey J Zeiger
Represented By: Brenton A. Rogers
Represented By: Nadar Boulos
Represented By: Chris LeMastus Dickerson
Represented By: Jeffrey Daniel Pawlitz
Represented By: Brian L. Shaw
Represented By: David Richard Seligman
Represented By: Thanhan Nguyen
Represented By: Stephen Charles Hackney
Represented By: Benjamin B Kelly
Represented By: Gregg Galardi
Represented By: Nicole L Greenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Patrick S. Layng
Represented By: Adam G. Brief
Represented By: Roman Sukley
Represented By: Cameron M Gulden
Represented By: Denise Ann Delaurent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?