Kendra Scott, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Kendra Scott, LLC
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", zhangyao137, Women Jewelry Accessories Store, Born Free Jewellery Store, girllovefashion, tuanshang, ZWPON Store, SLOONGJEWELRY Official Store, anglestore, Zhao Feng, ZWPON Bijoux Store, AffordableCamp, Kendra Store, koucoco0729, Europe and the United States boutique wholesale, qinrourou, GET IT GIRL Store, WiWi Store, diaozhatian Store, lixiuqin, Surprise gifts, Uran Store, luotian, lacoogh Official Store, Shop4688047 Store, Dream lover jewelry, Shop4357016 Store, Farooneejewelry Store, zhenghuaxing, RscvonM Official Store, ModaOne Jewerly Store, Kingdom Ma KDM Factory Store, Bighomeshop, fushi, Yikong digital store, Ladies' Fashion, Wylala, Qiao La Official Store, YW-xinmi International, PHINA Official Store, YiWu Spring Jewelry, Dressed Store, Little Fortunate Store, Factory to customers Store, chengfen, Shenzhen KLH Trading Co Ltd, taihong, Shop4655062 Store, Shop419624 Store, colorful.gem Official Store, ModaOne Jewelry Store, buyingsupermarket2014, yangyanli, 17KM Official Store, wan123456, Dreamin Store, 51Luckind Official Store, yiwushishengxushipinyouxiangongsi, youyouxing, LL YUN Store and Merci Store
Case Number: 1:2019cv04205
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kendra Scott, LLC as to certain Defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kendra Scott, LLC by Abby Marie Neu (Neu, Abby)
July 31, 2019 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kendra Scott, LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abby M. Neu)(Neu, Abby)
July 31, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Kingdom Ma Kdm Factory Store and all other Defendants identified in the Amended Complaint. (lw, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 38 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/30/2019. Mailed notice (cc, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status and motion hearing held on 7/30/19. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #34 is granted. Enter preliminary injunction order. Oral motion to unseal documents is granted. The Clerk is directed to unseal #10 , #11 , [11-1], [11-2], #19 , #20 , and #29 . Status hearing set for 9/11/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Any motion for default judgment shall be properly noticed for the next court date. Mailed notice (cc, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #34 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/30/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
July 24, 2019 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM by Kendra Scott, LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #34 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 24, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION by Plaintiff Kendra Scott, LLC for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
July 15, 2019 BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00, Receipt no. 4624226928 posted by Kendra Scott, LLC (jn, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend the temporary restraining order entered 7/2/19 #30 is granted. The Court finds that good cause exists to extend the temporary restraining order, and the order is hereby extended an additional fourteen days, to 7/30/19. The 7/16/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The status hearing set for 7/16/19 is stricken and reset for 7/30/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #30 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/16/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by Kendra Scott, LLC in support of extension of time #30 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION by Plaintiff Kendra Scott, LLC for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 29 SEALED ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/2/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 7/2/19. Plaintiffs' motions for leave to file under seal #6 and for electronic service of process #21 are granted. Plaintiffs' ex parte motion for temporary restraining order #15 is also granted. Enter sealed order. Status hearing set for 7/16/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kendra Scott, LLC by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake)
June 26, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Kendra Scott, LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 25 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Kendra Scott, LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for leave to file #6 , motion for temporary restraining order #15 , motion for miscellaneous relief #21 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/2/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #22 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Kendra Scott, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #21 (Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiff Kendra Scott, LLCfor Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Kendra Scott, LLC Exhibit 5 regarding declaration #18 (Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Kendra Scott, LLC Exhibit 4 - Parts 1-6 regarding declaration #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-1, #2 Exhibit 4-2, #3 Exhibit 4-3, #4 Exhibit 4-4, #5 Exhibit 4-5, #6 Exhibit 4-6)(Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Lilly Turnquist regarding memorandum in support of motion #16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Kendra Scott, LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order #15 (Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Kendra Scott, LLC for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Kendra Scott, LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order #12 (Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Kendra Scott, LLC for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Kendra Scott, LLC Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Kendra Scott, LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (gcy, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (gcy, )
June 24, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Kendra Scott, LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kendra Scott, LLC by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kendra Scott, LLC by Paul G. Juettner (Juettner, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kendra Scott, LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kendra Scott, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15958413. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kendra Scott, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Scott, LLC
Represented By: Paul G. Juettner
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Jake Michael Christensen
Represented By: Abby Marie Neu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhangyao137
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Women Jewelry Accessories Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Born Free Jewellery Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: girllovefashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tuanshang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZWPON Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLOONGJEWELRY Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: anglestore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhao Feng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZWPON Bijoux Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AffordableCamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: koucoco0729
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Europe and the United States boutique wholesale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: qinrourou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GET IT GIRL Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WiWi Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: diaozhatian Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lixiuqin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surprise gifts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uran Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: luotian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: lacoogh Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop4688047 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dream lover jewelry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop4357016 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farooneejewelry Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhenghuaxing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RscvonM Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ModaOne Jewerly Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom Ma KDM Factory Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bighomeshop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fushi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yikong digital store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladies' Fashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wylala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qiao La Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YW-xinmi International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHINA Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YiWu Spring Jewelry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dressed Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Fortunate Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Factory to customers Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chengfen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen KLH Trading Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: taihong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop4655062 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop419624 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: colorful.gem Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ModaOne Jewelry Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: buyingsupermarket2014
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yangyanli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 17KM Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wan123456
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreamin Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 51Luckind Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yiwushishengxushipinyouxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: youyouxing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LL YUN Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merci Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?