Dabney v. Bousson
Appellant: Lisa E. Dabney
Appellee: Don Bousson
Case Number: 1:2019cv04237
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Appellants motion to dismiss is granted. #3 This is action is hereby dismissed. No appearance is required on 7/2/2019. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/28/2019. Mailed notice (nsf, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Miller for presentment of motion to dismiss #3 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 7/2/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Miller, Michael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Appellant Lisa E. Dabney to dismiss (Miller, Michael)
June 26, 2019 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters to all counsel of record. (nsf, )
June 25, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Lisa E. Dabney by Michael A. Miller (Miller, Michael)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 B 30412 (Judge Goldgar) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dabney v. Bousson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lisa E. Dabney
Represented By: Michael A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Don Bousson
Represented By: David Jay Axelrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?