Strike 3 Holdings, LLC vs Doe

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv04247
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 8/26/19 is stricken and re-set to 9/6/19 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS Report by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Herman, Timothy)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference #8 is granted. Motion hearing date of 7/25/19 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #8 For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Herman, Timothy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Robert Herman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #8 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/25/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Herman, Timothy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLCFor Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Herman, Timothy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 8/26/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (nsf, )
June 25, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT A TO COMPLAINT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Herman, Timothy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re attorney appearance #3 OF FILING FRCP 7.1 AND LR 3.2 DISCLOSURE (Herman, Timothy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Timothy Robert Herman (Herman, Timothy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herman, Timothy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ACTION FOR DAMAGES FOR PROPERTY RIGHTS INFRINGEMENT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15965317.(Herman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC vs Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Robert Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?