Franklin v. Askew et al
Plaintiff: Martinez Franklin
Defendant: Jose Gomez, City of Harvey, an Illinois Municipal Corporation, Rasheed Askew and The City of Harvey
Case Number: 1:2019cv04375
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Referring Judge: Sunil R Harjani
2 Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report #31 . Despite having at least two months since the Court's prior order #23 , the parties have not identified agreed-upon dates for their depositions, in contravention of this Court's order. The parties shall confer and file an updated status report that complies with this Court's order by 1/27/20. Mailed notice (lxs, )
January 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Joint Status Report Regarding Discovery by Rasheed Askew, Jose Gomez, The City of Harvey (Kunkle, Kathleen)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONFIDENTIALITY Order Signed by the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani on 12/19/2019. Mailed notice(lxs, )
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Defendants' motion for entry of a confidentiality order #24 is granted. Defendant has proposed modest changes to the model confidentiality order used in this district. Plaintiff has agreed to the changes in Alternative A in Section 4 and Section 6, but has objected to the remainder of the changes. Plaintiff does not explain the basis for his objection. Defendant has identified that the discovery production will include personal information of law enforcement, include identifying information such as date of birth and residential addresses, employment and disciplinary files, and investigations associated with those disciplinary matters. Thus, defendant has properly tailored the model confidentiality order to the specific needs of this case. The other, very minor changes, are of similar nature. Accordingly, the Court will enter the proposed order. Mailed notice (lxs, )
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY by Rasheed Askew, Jose Gomez, The City of Harvey to Response #27 Defendants' Reply in Support of Thier Motion for Entry of Confidentiality Order (Kunkle, Kathleen)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Martinez Franklin to motion for protective order #24 (Bedi, Jonathan)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Regarding Defendants' Motion for Entry of Confidentiality Order #24 , Plaintiff shall file a response detailing his objections to Defendants' proposed changes to the Model Confidentiality Order supported by citations to authority by 12/13/2019. Defendants may file a reply with citations to authority by 12/17/2019. Motion hearing set for 12/12/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lxs, )
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Margaret Kunkle for presentment of motion for protective order #24 before Honorable Sunil R. Harjani on 12/12/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Kunkle, Kathleen)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION by Defendants Rasheed Askew, Jose Gomez, The City of Harvey for protective order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kunkle, Kathleen)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Status hearing held and continued to 1/28/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Counsel reported on the progress of discovery. By 12/6/2019, the parties shall file an agreed motion for entry of a confidentiality order and submit an agreed confidentiality order to the Court's Proposed Order Box at Proposed_Order_Harjani@ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties shall produce responsive documents and responses to written discovery by 12/27/2019. By 1/20/2020, the parties shall file a joint status report identifying all deponents and agreed-upon dates for their depositions. Mailed notice (lxs, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Martinez Franklin. (Bedi, Jonathan)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendants Rasheed Askew, Jose Gomez, The City of Harvey. (Kunkle, Kathleen)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Initial status hearing held. Counsel reported on the status of the case. Parties are beginning discovery and, at this time, anticipate taking approximately 10 depositions in total. Status hearing set for 11/26/2019 at 9:15 a.m. for a report on discovery. Mailed notice (lxs, )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: At counsel's request, status hearing set for 9/17/2019 is stricken and reset to 9/18/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (lxs, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Initial status hearing set for 9/17/2019 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom 1858. Mailed notice (lxs, )
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Sunil R. Harjani for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery scheduling and supervision and any settlement conference. (air, )Mailed notice.
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held. The parties proposed case management schedule is adopted as follows: parties to serve Initial Responses by 9/27/19; parties to issue written discovery by 10/30/19; fact discovery cutoff is 4/27/2020; Plaintiff's expert report due 6/24/2020; Defendants' disclosures due by 7/27/2020; all expert discovery to be completed by 8/26/20. The deadline for motions to amend the pleadings is 1/27/20. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Harjani for further discovery scheduling and supervision; the referral will also include the authority to conduct a settlement conference as necessary. Mailed notice (air, )
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATUS Report by Martinez Franklin (Bedi, Jonathan)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Rasheed Askew, Jose Gomez, The City of Harvey(Raines, Shawnte)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Rasheed Askew, Jose Gomez, The City of Harvey by Ellen Kornichuk Emery (Emery, Ellen)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to 8/26/19 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint #9 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. This case is set for an initial status conference on 9/10/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 9/4/19. Mailed notice (air, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/23/19. (smm, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Margaret Kunkle for presentment of extension of time #9 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/31/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kunkle, Kathleen)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants Rasheed Askew, Jose Gomez, The City of Harvey for extension of time (Kunkle, Kathleen)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Rasheed Askew, Jose Gomez, The City of Harvey by Shawnte Miaundra Raines (Raines, Shawnte)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Rasheed Askew, Jose Gomez, The City of Harvey by Kathleen Margaret Kunkle (Kunkle, Kathleen)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued three original and three copies as to Defendants Rasheed Askew, Jose Gomez, The City of Harvey (las, )
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Martinez Franklin by Dena M Singer (Singer, Dena)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Martinez Franklin by Jonathan S Bedi (Bedi, Jonathan)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bedi, Jonathan)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Martinez Franklin; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15980031.(Bedi, Jonathan)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Askew et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Gomez
Represented By: Kathleen Margaret Kunkle
Represented By: Shawnte Miaundra Raines
Represented By: Ellen Kornichuk Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Harvey, an Illinois Municipal Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasheed Askew
Represented By: Kathleen Margaret Kunkle
Represented By: Shawnte Miaundra Raines
Represented By: Ellen Kornichuk Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Harvey
Represented By: Kathleen Margaret Kunkle
Represented By: Shawnte Miaundra Raines
Represented By: Ellen Kornichuk Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martinez Franklin
Represented By: Dena M Singer
Represented By: Jonathan S Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?