Ebert v. Gecker
Appellant: Chaz Ebert
Appellee: Frances Gecker
Case Number: 1:2019cv04376
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Appellant's opening brief is to be filed by 9/16/2019. Appellee's response brief is to be filed by 10/15/2019. Appellant's reply brief is to be filed by 10/29/2019. (mk)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on May 23, 2019 and June 13, 2019 regarding Notice of Appeal #7 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Ross, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant/Appellee Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #5 sent to Attorney Erik William Chalut returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Erik William Chalut a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (mc, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant Chaz Ebert by David C. Gustman (Gustman, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Frances Gecker by Micah R. Krohn (Krohn, Micah)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Frances Gecker by Frances Gecker (Gecker, Frances)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (kp, )
June 28, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 02 B 22977 (Judge Thorne) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ebert v. Gecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Chaz Ebert
Represented By: David C. Gustman
Represented By: Devon Joseph Eggert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Frances Gecker
Represented By: Micah R. Krohn
Represented By: Sven Thure Nylen
Represented By: Frances Gecker
Represented By: Matthew J. Piers
Represented By: Erik William Chalut
Represented By: Kevin R. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?