Bednarski v. Epsilon
Plaintiff: Joseph Bednarski
Defendant: Epsilon
Case Number: 1:2019cv04399
Filed: June 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) and Affirmative Defenses by Epsilon(Jones, Jennifer)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Epsilon (Jones, Jennifer)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Epsilon by Jennifer Lynn Jones (Epsilon incorrectly named as defendant. Appearance filed on behalf of Alliance Data Systems) (Jones, Jennifer)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Epsilon by Jody A. Boquist (Epsilon incorrectly named as defendant. Appearance filed on behalf of Alliance Data Systems) (Boquist, Jody)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED Complaint (Smith, Steven)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #4 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint by 8/23/2019. The parties are to serve its MIDP initial disclosures by 9/23/2019. The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 9/25/2019. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 10/1/2019 at 9:45 a.m. The motion hearing set for 8/13/2019 is stricken. (rao, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Lynn Jones for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #4 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 8/13/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Jones, Jennifer)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendant Epsilon for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, counterclaim #1 or otherwise plead (Jones, Jennifer)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, )
July 2, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Steven)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joseph Bednarski; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15986332.,(Smith, Steven). (Docket text modified by the Clerk's Office) Modified on 7/2/2019 (mc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bednarski v. Epsilon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bednarski
Represented By: Steven Russell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epsilon
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Jones
Represented By: Jody A. Boquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?