Wham-O Holding, Ltd. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Intersport Corp. and Wham-O Holding, Ltd.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Case Number: 1:2019cv04407
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
August 24, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
August 22, 2019 Filing 38 FINAL Judgment Order. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/22/2019. Mailed notice(vcf, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' motion for entry of default and default judgment against the Defendants identified in the first amended schedule A #32 is granted. Status hearing set for 9/19/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint by The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A". (Attachments: #1 Answers)(kp, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE by The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp., Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A #32 . (kp, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for default judgment #32 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 8/22/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
August 14, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM by Intersport Corp., Wham-O Holding, Ltd. in support of motion for default judgment #32 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 2 to Memo in Support, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt)(Vogt, Keith)
August 14, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp., Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith)
August 12, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
August 11, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
August 9, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
August 5, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
August 2, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" by Depeng Bi for the store REEDOW-FITNESS only (Bi, Depeng)
July 30, 2019 Filing 26 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/30/2019. Mailed notice(vcf, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to extend the temporary restraining order #17 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #20 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 24 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Wham-O Holding, Ltd. (Document not scanned). (mma, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wham-O Holding, Ltd., Intersport Corp. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Vogt, Keith)
July 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #20 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM by Intersport Corp., Wham-O Holding, Ltd. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #20 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of KVogt)(Vogt, Keith)
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp., Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for preliminary injunction (Vogt, Keith)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing set for 7/23/2019 is reset to 7/30/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (vcf, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of extension of time #17 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiffs Intersport Corp., Wham-O Holding, Ltd. for extension of time for Temporary Restraining Order (Vogt, Keith)
July 11, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant houseshop-2019 and all other Defendants identified in the Complaint.(pj, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 SEALED Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/9/2019. Mailed notice(vcf, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file under seal #7 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to exceed page limitation #8 is granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary transfer of the Defendant domain names, a temporary asset restraint, expedited discovery, and service of process by email and/or electronic publication 9 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (kp, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (kp, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Motion for presentment of #7 #8 9 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for leave to file #7 , motion for leave to file excess pages #8 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/9/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. Sealed Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Todd Richards regarding memorandum in support of motion #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 2, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2, Part 3, #4 Exhibit 2, Part 4, #5 Exhibit 2, Part 5, #6 Exhibit 2, Part 6, #7 Exhibit 2, Part 7, #8 Exhibit 2, Part 8)(Vogt, Keith)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF 9 EX PARTE MOTION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1-6 to Declaration of KVogt, #3 Declaration of Todd Richards, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of TRichards)(Vogt, Keith)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. for leave to file excess pages (Vogt, Keith)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. Schedule A to Complaint (Vogt, Keith)
July 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O, WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by WHAM-O HOLDING, LTD., INTERSPORT CORP. d/b/a WHAM-O; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15985187. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vogt, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wham-O Holding, Ltd. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intersport Corp.
Represented By: Yi Bu
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wham-O Holding, Ltd.
Represented By: Yi Bu
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Represented By: Depeng Bi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?