Sharpe Innovations, Inc. v. United States Cellular Corporation
Plaintiff: Sharpe Innovations, Inc.
Defendant: United States Cellular Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv04411
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 35 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 certified order) (bg, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation of dismissal, the Court dismisses this case with prejudice and with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (rj, )
November 28, 2019 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 18, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: At the parties' request, Status hearing set for 11/19/2019 is stricken and reset to 12/5/2019 at 1:30 PM. Mailed notice (rj, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion to reset the initial status hearing #29 . The Court reschedules this hearing to 11/19/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (rj, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Isaac Philip Rabicoff for presentment of motion to continue #29 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 11/7/2019 at 01:30 PM. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
November 4, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION by Plaintiff Sharpe Innovations, Inc. to continue (Rabicoff, Isaac)
October 28, 2019 Filing 28 STATUS Report by Sharpe Innovations, Inc. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
October 24, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by United States Cellular Corporation(Johnson, Edward)
October 24, 2019 Filing 26 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by United States Cellular Corporation (Johnson, Edward)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The Court grants leave for Edward D. Johnson, Michael A. Molano, Priya A. Desai, and B. Clayton McCraw to substitute as counsel for USCC, and for Douglas I. Lewis and Eric Taylor O'Brien to withdraw their appearances as counsel for USCC #20 . Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #22 , #23 , #24 are granted. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/22/2019. Mailed notice. (bg, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16349211. (Johnson, Edward)
October 17, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16349196. (McCraw, Barry)
October 17, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Molano. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16348027. (Molano, Michael) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/17/2019 (ph, ).
October 17, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Priya Ashley Desai for presentment of motion to substitute attorney #20 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/23/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Desai, Priya)
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant United States Cellular Corporation to substitute attorney (Desai, Priya)
October 17, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United States Cellular Corporation by Priya Ashley Desai (Desai, Priya)
September 18, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #16 . Defendant's responsive pleading is due by 10/24/19. The Court strikes the status date set for 10/8/19 and resets it to 11/7/19 at 1:30 p.m., with the initial status report due by 10/28/19. The Court notes that this will be the final extension. Mailed notice (rj, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 Joint NOTICE of Motion by Douglas I. Lewis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #16 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 9/19/2019 at 01:30 PM. (Lewis, Douglas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant United States Cellular Corporation for extension of time to file answer (JOINT) (Lewis, Douglas)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Motion by Eric T. O'Brien for leave to appear pro hac vice #14 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 8/21/2019. Mailed notice. (bg, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric T. O'Brien. Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 4624228401. (jjr, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion hearing held on 8/13/2019. Joint motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint, file the joint initial status report and continue the initial status conference #11 is granted. Initial status hearing set for 9/4/2019 is stricken and reset to 10/8/2019 at 9:30 AM with initial status report due by 9/27/2019. Defendant's answer is due by 9/24/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Douglas I. Lewis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #11 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 8/13/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Lewis, Douglas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant United States Cellular Corporation for extension of time to file answer OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, FILE THE JOINT INITIAL STATUS REPORT AND CONTINUE THE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE (JOINT MOTION) (Lewis, Douglas)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading is due by 8/25/19. Mailed notice (cn).
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Douglas I. Lewis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/30/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Lewis, Douglas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant United States Cellular Corporation for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Lewis, Douglas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United States Cellular Corporation by Douglas I. Lewis (Lewis, Douglas)
July 6, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 400, receipt no. 0752-15988673, regarding complaint #1 (Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA. (bg, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 9/4/2019 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 8/28/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
July 2, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant United States Cellular Corporation (ec, )
July 2, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Sharpe Innovations, Inc. re complaint #1 (Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sharpe Innovations, Inc. by Isaac Philip Rabicoff (Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sharpe Innovations, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15988673. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharpe Innovations, Inc. v. United States Cellular Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Cellular Corporation
Represented By: Eric Taylor O'Brien
Represented By: Douglas I. Lewis
Represented By: Priya Ashley Desai
Represented By: Barry Clayton McCraw
Represented By: Michael A. Molano
Represented By: Edward D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharpe Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?