NBA Properties, Inc. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: NHL Enterprises, L.P., NFL Properties LLC, Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Inc., IMG College Licensing, LLC and Major League Baseball Properties, Inc.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", newyorkcityswag, thotr-30, kekun _ 78, malanderrenfoe5_2, carhi _ 31, fncbds, cheaplysold12, tarheelonetime, gal6355, beizzzz, the-secrete-inventory, loewenstern, jocar2452, larrholber _ 0, jerse-3616 and ro-238273
Case Number: 1:2019cv04412
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Referring Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 54 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0025 Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9, 2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Martha M. Pacolds webpage on the Courts website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold for all further proceedings. Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/23/2019.(lma, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 53 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/6/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 52 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 8/6/2019. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #46 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 51 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
August 1, 2019 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Inc., IMG College Licensing, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NHL Enterprises, L.P., NFL Properties LLC as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jake M. Christensen)(Christensen, Jake)
August 1, 2019 Filing 49 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake)
August 1, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction, #46 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/6/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM by Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. in support of motion for preliminary injunction, #46 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION by Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. as to certain Defendants (Martin, Allyson)
July 23, 2019 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 7/23/2019. Plaintiffs' motion to extend the temporary restraining order #41 is granted. The temporary restraining order is extended to 8/6/2019. Status hearing is set for 8/6/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time, #41 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/23/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM by Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. in support of extension of time, #41 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION by Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
July 15, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant YU ZICHENG and all other Defendants identified in the Amended Complaint (lma, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Correction regarding summons issued. (lw, )
July 15, 2019 Entered in error.
July 15, 2019 BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00, Receipt no. 4624226933 posted by Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. (jn, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 39 SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/9/2019. Mailed notice.(ym, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 7/9/2019. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file under seal #6 , motion for entry of temporary restraining order #12 and motion for electronic service of process #28 are all granted. Enter Order. Status hearing is set for 7/23/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 37 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. (Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 36 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by NHL Enterprises, L.P. (Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 35 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by NFL Properties LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 34 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by NBA Properties, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 33 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 32 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by IMG College Licensing, LLC (Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order, #12 , motion for leave to file, #6 , motion for miscellaneous relief, #28 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/9/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion, #29 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief, #28 (Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 27 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. Exhibit 2 regarding declaration #21 (Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 26 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. Exhibit 1 - Parts 41-48 regarding declaration #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-41, #2 Exhibit 1-42, #3 Exhibit 1-43, #4 Exhibit 1-44, #5 Exhibit 1-45, #6 Exhibit 1-46, #7 Exhibit 1-47, #8 Exhibit 1-48)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 25 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. Exhibit 1 - Parts 31-40 regarding declaration #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-31, #2 Exhibit 1-32, #3 Exhibit 1-33, #4 Exhibit 1-34, #5 Exhibit 1-35, #6 Exhibit 1-36, #7 Exhibit 1-37, #8 Exhibit 1-38, #9 Exhibit 1-39, #10 Exhibit 1-40)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 24 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. Exhibit 1 - Parts 21-30 regarding declaration #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-21, #2 Exhibit 1-22, #3 Exhibit 1-23, #4 Exhibit 1-24, #5 Exhibit 1-25, #6 Exhibit 1-26, #7 Exhibit 1-27, #8 Exhibit 1-28, #9 Exhibit 1-29, #10 Exhibit 1-30)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. Exhibit 1 - Parts 11-20 regarding declaration #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11, #2 Exhibit 1-12, #3 Exhibit 1-13, #4 Exhibit 1-14, #5 Exhibit 1-15, #6 Exhibit 1-16, #7 Exhibit 1-17, #8 Exhibit 1-18, #9 Exhibit 1-19, #10 Exhibit 1-20)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 22 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. Exhibit 1 - Parts 1-10 regarding declaration #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 1-3, #4 Exhibit 1-4, #5 Exhibit 1-5, #6 Exhibit 1-6, #7 Exhibit 1-7, #8 Exhibit 1-8, #9 Exhibit 1-9, #10 Exhibit 1-10)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Lindsay Conn regarding memorandum in support of motion, #13 (Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Kurtis Mason regarding memorandum in support of motion, #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Thomas H. Prochnow regarding memorandum in support of motion, #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Dolores F. DiBella regarding memorandum in support of motion, #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Ayala Deutsch regarding memorandum in support of motion, #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Ethan Orlinsky regarding memorandum in support of motion, #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Lindsay Victor regarding memorandum in support of motion, #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion, #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #12 (Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. Schedule A regarding complaint, #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (jh, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jh, )
July 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, IMG College Licensing, LLC, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., NBA Properties, Inc., NFL Properties LLC, NHL Enterprises, L.P. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by IMG College Licensing, LLC, Major League Baseball Properties, Inc., Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges, MLB Advanced Media, L.P., NBA Properties, Inc., NHL Enterprises, L.P., NFL Properties LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15985655. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NBA Properties, Inc. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: newyorkcityswag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: thotr-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kekun _ 78
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: malanderrenfoe5_2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: carhi _ 31
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fncbds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: cheaplysold12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tarheelonetime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gal6355
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: beizzzz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: the-secrete-inventory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: loewenstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jocar2452
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: larrholber _ 0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jerse-3616
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ro-238273
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NHL Enterprises, L.P.
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Jake Michael Christensen
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NFL Properties LLC
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Jake Michael Christensen
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Regents for the Oklahoma Agricultural and Mechanical Colleges
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Jake Michael Christensen
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MLB Advanced Media, L.P.
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Jake Michael Christensen
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NBA Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Jake Michael Christensen
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IMG College Licensing, LLC
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Jake Michael Christensen
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major League Baseball Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Jake Michael Christensen
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?