Alexander v. Vaughn
Appellee: Tom Vaughn
Appellant: Tunya Alexander
Case Number: 1:2019cv04415
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED, for document #3 sent to Tunya Alexander returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form. (smm, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Docket Sheet)(USBC-Ross, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018, the appellant shall serve and file the opening brief within 30 days after the docketing of notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically. The appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days thereafter. The appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days of the appellee's response brief. The matter will then be taken under advisement as fully-briefed. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) Letter, #2 Attorney Appearance Form).(smm, )
July 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 19 B 10728 (Judge Cassling) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter NOA, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 In Froma Pauperis)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tom Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tunya Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?