KONTROLFREEK, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: KONTROLFREEK, LLC
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", always_here_for_you_ee, allyouneed12321, kingt-shirts, YXCO 01, fastandfree4 all, Movsemi01, advaaharoni, rogermall1, zipgab0, the-big-market, rabshop1, shaha-2960, sixnics, wheatlucy111 and wheating222
Case Number: 1:2019cv04420
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Referring Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
August 26, 2019 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:This case has been reassigned, the status hearing set for 8/28/19 and motion hearing set for 8/29/19 are stricken. The motion should be re-noticed before Judge Pacold. Mailed notice (ca, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 44 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0025 Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9, 2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Martha M. Pacolds webpage on the Courts website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold for all further proceedings. Honorable John Z. Lee no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/23/2019.(tg, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for leave to file #42 , motion for default judgment #39 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/29/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
August 21, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION by Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC for leave to file [Certain] Documents Under Seal (Vogt, Keith)
August 21, 2019 Filing 41 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC MEMORANDUM by KONTROLFREEK, LLC in support of motion for default judgment #39 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashish Mistry)(Vogt, Keith)
August 21, 2019 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM by KONTROLFREEK, LLC in support of motion for default judgment #39 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 2 to Memo in Support, #3 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #4 Declaration of Ashish Mistry)(Vogt, Keith)
August 21, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION by Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC for default judgment as to The Defendants Identified In The First Amended Schedule A (Vogt, Keith)
August 19, 2019 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Pursuant to the notice of dismissal, Defendants Line No. 82 rabshop1, allyouneed12321 Line No. 53, wheatlucy111 Line No. 93, wheating222 Line 21, and rogermall-1 Line No. 86 are dismissed without prejudice. Mailed notice (ca, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
August 12, 2019 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Pursuant to the notice of dismissal, Defendants Line No. 26 always_here_for_you_ee; Line No. 20 the-big-market; Line No. 23 fastandfree4 all, Line No. 25 sixnics; and Line No. 69 kingt-shirts are dismissed without prejudice. Mailed notice (ca, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
August 7, 2019 Filing 34 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/7/19.Mailed notice(ca, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion hearing held on 8/7/19. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #27 is granted. The clerk is directed to unseal the case.Mailed notice (ca, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Pursuant to the notice of dismissal, Defendant Line No. 39 Movsemi01 is dismissed without prejudice. Mailed notice (ca, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
July 31, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Pursuant to the notice of dismissal, Defendants Line No. 19 shaha-2960; Line No. 51 advaaharoni; Line No. 95 zipgab0 are dismissed without prejudice. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #27 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/7/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
July 30, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by KONTROLFREEK, LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #27 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of KVogt)(Vogt, Keith)
July 30, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC for preliminary injunction (Vogt, Keith)
July 30, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Vogt, Keith)
July 26, 2019 Filing 25 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by KONTROLFREEK, LLC (Document not imaged) (bg, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 24 SEALED ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/23/2019. (jjr, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KONTROLFREEK, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Vogt, Keith)
July 19, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of extension of time #21 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/24/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
July 19, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC for extension of time for Temporary Restraining Order (Vogt, Keith)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 SEALED TEMPORARY Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/10/2019. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 SEALED ORDER. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/10/2019. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
July 10, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant 2014idbrick and all other Defendants identified in the Complaint. (ec, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Motion for presentment of #14 #15 #16 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of before Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/10/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF EX PARTE MOTION #16 FOR ENTRY OF A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, INCLUDING A TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, A TEMPORARY TRANSFER OF THE DEFENDANT DOMAIN NAMES, A TEMPORARY ASSET RESTRAINT, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, AND SERVICE OF PROCESS BY E-MAIL AND/OR ELECTRONIC PUBLICATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1-6 to Declaration of KVogt, #3 Declaration of Ashish H. Mistry, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of AMistry, #5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of AMistry, #6 Exhibit 3, Part 1 to Declaration of AMistry, #7 Exhibit 3, Part 2 to Declaration of AMistry, #8 Exhibit 3, Part 3 to Declaration of AMistry, #9 Exhibit 3, Part 4 to Declaration of AMistry)(Vogt, Keith)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC PLAINTIFF EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, INCLUDING A TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, A TEMPORARY TRANSFER OF THE DEFENDANT DOMAIN NAMES, A TEMPORARY ASSET RESTRAINT, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, AND SERVICE OF PROCESS BY EMAIL AND/OR ELECTRONIC PUBLICATION (Vogt, Keith)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC PLAINTIFF MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION (Vogt, Keith)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (Vogt, Keith)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC Schedule A to Complaint (Vogt, Keith)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 trademarks, #2 Exhibit 2 copyrights)(Vogt, Keith)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 8/28/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC by Yi Bu CORRECTED Attorney Appearance for Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC by Yi Bu #6 (Bu, Yi)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC by Yanling Jiang CORRECTED Attorney Appearance for Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC by by Yanling Jiang #5 (Jiang, Yanling)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC by Keith A. Vogt CORRECTED Attorney Appearance for Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC by Keith A. Vogt #4 (Vogt, Keith)
July 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15985872. (Vogt, Keith)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff KONTROLFREEK, LLC Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Vogt, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KONTROLFREEK, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: always_here_for_you_ee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: allyouneed12321
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kingt-shirts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YXCO 01
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fastandfree4 all
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Movsemi01
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: advaaharoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rogermall1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zipgab0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: the-big-market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rabshop1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shaha-2960
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sixnics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wheatlucy111
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wheating222
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KONTROLFREEK, LLC
Represented By: Yi Bu
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?