Ely Holdings Limited et al v. O'Keeffe's, Inc. d/b/a SaftiFirst
Plaintiff: Ely Holdings Limited and Greenlite Glass Systems, Inc.
Defendant: O'Keeffe's, Inc.
Petitioner: Crown Corr, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04428
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Referring Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: It appearing that the matters in this case are resolved by the Court's order of 7/22/19 (Dkt. 14), this case is terminated. Mailed notice. (dm, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0024 Pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9,2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been randomly selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Mary M. Rowland's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order shall not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland for all further proceedings. Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/22/2019.(rp, )
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON CROWN CORR INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA, signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/22/2019. The ruling date of 7/23/2019 is vacated based on the entry of this order. (mk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant O'Keeffe's, Inc. by Mark Isaac Schickman (Schickman, Mark)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY by Crown Corr, Inc. to Response #10 Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shah, Jaimin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: A response to the motion to quash subpoena has already been filed. The hearing date of 7/16/2019 is vacated. Movant is to file a reply to the response by 7/19/2019. The motion is set for argument (if deemed necessary by the Court) and ruling on 7/23/2019 at 9:30 AM. (mk) (pjg, ).
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Defendant O'Keeffe's, Inc. to notice of motion #9 Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Schickman, Mark)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Jaimin Hemendra Shah for presentment of before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Shah, Jaimin)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Crown Corr, Inc. by Jayna M. Cacioppo (Cacioppo, Jayna)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Crown Corr, Inc. by Jaimin Hemendra Shah Corrected Attorney Appearance (Shah, Jaimin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBIT by Movant Crown Corr, Inc. Exhibit B regarding memorandum in support of motion #4 (Shah, Jaimin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Crown Corr, Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Shah, Jaimin)
July 2, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Answer and Counterclaim, #4 Exhibit D - Moell Declaration)(Shah, Jaimin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant Crown Corr, Inc. by Jaimin Hemendra Shah (Shah, Jaimin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Shah, Jaimin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Crown Corr, Inc. Notice of Motion to Quash Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-15987831. (Shah, Jaimin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ely Holdings Limited et al v. O'Keeffe's, Inc. d/b/a SaftiFirst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ely Holdings Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenlite Glass Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Keeffe's, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Isaac Schickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Crown Corr, Inc.
Represented By: Jaimin Hemendra Shah
Represented By: Jayna M. Cacioppo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?