WHOA Networks, Inc., et al., v. Hipskind
Plaintiff: WHOA Networks, Inc.
Defendant: Stephen W. Hipskind
Case Number: 1:2019cv04625
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk5, Docket)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket6, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 35 STATUS Report by Stephen W. Hipskind (Christensen, Thomas)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket5, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (td, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held. The defendant's motion to dismiss #25 remains under advisement. Mailed notice (air, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY by Defendant Stephen W. Hipskind to motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #25 in support of Supplemental Brief as to Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Christensen, Thomas)
November 15, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time #27 is granted. The reply brief as to subject matter jurisdiction is now due 11/19/19. No appearance on the motion is required. Mailed notice (air, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Jenna Nicole Wadulak for presentment of extension of time #27 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 11/20/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Wadulak, Jenna)
November 14, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Defendant Stephen W. Hipskind for extension of time to Reply in Support of His Supplemental Brief as to Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Wadulak, Jenna)
October 31, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE by Plaintiff WHOA Networks, Inc. to motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #25 Response to Supplemental Brief as to Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fardy, P.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION by Defendant Stephen W. Hipskind to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction as to subject matter (Wadulak, Jenna)
September 9, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The parties' obligations under the MIDP program are stayed pending resolution of the issue of the Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Mailed notice (air, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held and continued to 12/5/19 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff's supplemental brief as to subject matter jurisdiction is due by 10/3/19; Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant's response is due by 10/31/19; reply due by 11/14/19. The Court will rule by CM/ECF notice and set further dates as needed. Mailed notice (air, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 Defendant Stephen Hipskind's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint and Counterclaim by Stephen W. Hipskind(Christensen, Thomas)
August 29, 2019 Filing 21 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by WHOA Networks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fardy, P.)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendant's unopposed motion for additional extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiffs' complaint #18 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Defendant may respond by 8/30/19. Mailed notice (air, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Andrew Christensen for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #18 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 8/29/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Christensen, Thomas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Stephen W. Hipskind for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (Christensen, Thomas)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to 8/23/19 to respond to the complaint #15 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. The initial status conference currently scheduled for 8/15 #11 is reset to 9/5/19 at 9:00 a.m. Initial status report due 8/29/19. Mailed notice (air, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Jenna Nicole Wadulak for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #15 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 8/7/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Wadulak, Jenna)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Stephen W. Hipskind for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (Wadulak, Jenna)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Stephen W. Hipskind by Jenna Nicole Wadulak (Wadulak, Jenna)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Stephen W. Hipskind by Thomas Andrew Christensen (Christensen, Thomas)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs WHOA Networks, Inc., WHOA Networks, Inc. by William Daniel Patterson (Patterson, William)
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: This case is set for an initial status conference on 8/15/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 8/13/19. Mailed notice (air, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WHOA Networks, Inc. as to Stephen W. Hipskind on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (McGinley Reilly, Jonna)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs WHOA Networks, Inc., WHOA Networks, Inc. by Alan Craig Gold (Gold, Alan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Alan Craig Gold's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs #7 is granted. Counsel is directed to file his appearance. Mailed notice (air, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16017720. (Gold, Alan)
July 10, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Stephen W. Hipskind (yt)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
July 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff WHOA Networks, Inc. by Jonna McGinley Reilly (McGinley Reilly, Jonna)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibit to Complaint by WHOA Networks, Inc. Exhibit E to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 . (Fardy, P.) Modified on 7/10/2019 (smm, ).
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff WHOA Networks, Inc. by P. Stephen Fardy (Fardy, P.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fardy, P.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request for Declaratory Judgment filed by WHOA Networks, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16011320. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Fardy, P.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHOA Networks, Inc., et al., v. Hipskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen W. Hipskind
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Christensen
Represented By: Jenna Nicole Wadulak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHOA Networks, Inc.
Represented By: P. Stephen Fardy
Represented By: William Daniel Patterson
Represented By: Alan Craig Gold
Represented By: Jonna McGinley Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?