The Maya Group, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: The Maya Group, Inc.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", Middle, Jetting Toy Store and Let's Playing Store
Case Number: 1:2019cv04633
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Maya Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Vogt, Keith)
August 6, 2019 Filing 28 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on August 6, 2019. Mailed notice (ph, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status and motion hearing held on Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #22 . As discussed during the hearing, Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #22 is granted: the four factors remain the same as when the TROs were entered. The order will be entered separately. Plaintiff anticipates accomplishing service on Defendants today. If Defendants fail to answer the complaint by the answer deadline, then they shall be deemed in default. Plaintiff shall file, no later than 09/09/2019, a motion for default judgment in a sum certain, noticed for presentment to coincide with the next status hearing date and time. Status hearing set for 09/12/2019 at 9:30 a.m.Emailed notice (slb, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 26 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by The Maya Group, Inc. (ph, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: At Plaintiff's request, the status and motion hearing of 08/05/2019 is reset to 08/06/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Emailed notice (slb, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #22 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 8/6/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
July 30, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by The Maya Group, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #22 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of KVogt)(Vogt, Keith)
July 30, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION by Plaintiff The Maya Group, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Vogt, Keith)
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of extension of time #19 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 8/5/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
July 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff The Maya Group, Inc. for extension of time for Temporary Restraining Order (Vogt, Keith)
July 22, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Middle and all other Defendants identified in the Complaint (lma, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 (REDACTED) TEMPORARY Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/16/2019. Mailed notice(gcy, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion hearing held. Motions for TRO, extra pages, electronic service, and to seal #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 , are granted. The TRO will be posted in a separate order. Status hearing is set for 08/05/2019 at 9:30 a.m. A motion for the renewal TRO or for preliminary injunction shall be filed by 07/25/2019, noticed for presentment at the next status hearing date and time. Mailed notice (ags, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the Court's own initiative, the motion hearing on 07/16/2019 is reset to 9 a.m. on the same date. Emailed notice (slb, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Motion for presentment of #11 #12 #13 NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/16/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff The Maya Group, Inc. MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION #13 FOR ENTRY OF A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, INCLUDING A TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, A TEMPORARY TRANSFER OF THE DEFENDANT DOMAIN NAMES, A TEMPORARY ASSET RESTRAINT, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, AND SERVICE OF PROCESS BY E-MAIL AND/OR ELECTRONIC PUBLICATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt, #2 Exhibit 1-6 to Declaration of KVogt, #3 Declaration of Oded Ben-Ezer, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Oded Ben-Ezer, #5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Oded Ben-Ezer)(Vogt, Keith)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff The Maya Group, Inc. PLAINTIFF EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, INCLUDING A TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, A TEMPORARY TRANSFER OF THE DEFENDANT DOMAIN NAMES, A TEMPORARY ASSET RESTRAINT, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, AND SERVICE OF PROCESS BY EMAIL AND/OR ELECTRONIC PUBLICATION (Vogt, Keith)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff The Maya Group, Inc. PLAINTIFF MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION (Vogt, Keith)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff The Maya Group, Inc. PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (Vogt, Keith)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff The Maya Group, Inc. Schedule A to Complaint (Vogt, Keith)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT (Attachments: #1 Trademark Information). (smm, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing set for 07/23/2019 at 9:00 AM.Emailed notice (slb, )
July 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Maya Group, Inc. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Maya Group, Inc. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Maya Group, Inc. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16013062. (Vogt, Keith)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff The Maya Group, Inc. COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 trademarks)(Vogt, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Maya Group, Inc. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jetting Toy Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Let's Playing Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Maya Group, Inc.
Represented By: Yi Bu
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Represented By: Keith A. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?