HSBC Bank USA, Inc. v. Henderson
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA, Inc.
Defendant: Jason Henderson
Case Number: 1:2019cv04636
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on plaintiff's motion to remand #9 as follows: Defendant's response is due by 9/4/2019. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo is set for 9/27/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Status hearing set for 8/16/2019 is stricken. No appearance required on 8/14/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Brian R Merfeld for presentment of motion to remand #9 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/14/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Merfeld, Brian)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by HSBC Bank USA, Inc. re MOTION by Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA, Inc. to remand #9 , attorney appearance #8 (Merfeld, Brian)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA, Inc. to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Merfeld, Brian)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA, Inc. by Brian R Merfeld (Merfeld, Brian)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. Status hearing set for 8/16/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (reg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ek, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Defendant Jason Henderson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ek, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Jason Henderson (ek, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (ek, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (17CH00470) and one copy filed by HSBC Bank USA, Inc. ; Notice. (Exhibit) (ek, ) Modified on 7/10/2019 (ek, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSBC Bank USA, Inc. v. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA, Inc.
Represented By: Brian R Merfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?