Beastgrip, Co. v. Shenzhen Dak Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Beastgrip, Co.
Defendant: Shenzhen Dak Technology Co., Ltd. and The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associates Identified On Shedule A
Case Number: 1:2019cv04642
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:As this case has already been terminated, the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #17 is denied as moot. Mailed notice (clw, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 19 MAILED Patent report with certified copy of minute order dated 7/18/2019 to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 certified order) (bg, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16048818. (Hu, Fei)
July 18, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing stricken. Motion of Lyle b. Vander Schaaf to appear pro hac vice #16 is granted. Motion for temporary restraining order #7 is withdrawn. Motions #9 and #10 are moot. This case is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated.Mailed notice (clw, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16042664. (Vander Schaaf, Lyle)
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shenzhen Dak Technology Co., Ltd. by Daniel Alexander Parrish (Parrish, Daniel)
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beastgrip, Co. by Jason Michael Wejnert (Wejnert, Jason)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beastgrip, Co. by Alok Ajay Parikh (Parikh, Alok)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 E-MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 exhibits)(las, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by William Cory Spence for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #7 , motion to seal, #10 , motion for leave to file excess pages #9 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 7/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Spence, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Beastgrip, Co. to seal Schedule A attached to the Complaint; Exhibits 4-10, 14-17 to the Complaint; Exhibits 7-9 to the Declaration of Parikh; Exhibits 6-11 to the Declaration of Chelenko; and Exhibits 1-4 to the Memorandum in Support Of Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Restraining Order (Spence, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Beastgrip, Co. for leave to file excess pages (Spence, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM motion for temporary restraining order #7 by Beastgrip, Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Declaration Alok Parikh, #3 Exhibit Parikh Declaration Exhibits 1-11, #4 Declaration Vadym Chalenko, #5 Exhibit Chalenko Declaration Exhibits 1-11)(Spence, William)
July 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Beastgrip, Co. for temporary restraining order (Spence, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Beastgrip, Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Spence, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beastgrip, Co. by William Cory Spence Alok Parikh (Spence, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beastgrip, Co. by William Cory Spence Jason Wejnert (Spence, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Beastgrip, Co. by William Cory Spence (Spence, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spence, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Beastgrip, Co.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16014633. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-17, #2 Exhibit Schedule A)(Spence, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beastgrip, Co. v. Shenzhen Dak Technology Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Dak Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Fei Hu
Represented By: Lyle Brent Vander Schaaf
Represented By: Daniel Alexander Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associates Identified On Shedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beastgrip, Co.
Represented By: William Cory Spence
Represented By: Jason Michael Wejnert
Represented By: Alok Ajay Parikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?