M.M. v. Evanston Township High School
Plaintiff: M.M., Heather M and John M
Defendant: Evanston Township High School
Case Number: 1:2019cv04646
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED complaint by M.M. against Evanston Township High School (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Dembs, Bradley)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by M.M.. Evanston Township High School waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Dembs, Bradley)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Heather M, John M, M.M. by Bradley Joseph Dembs (Dembs, Bradley)
July 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Heather M, John M, M.M. by Matthew David Cohen (Cohen, Matthew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Exhibit List by Heather M, John M, M.M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Cohen, Matthew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cohen, Matthew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by John M, M.M., Heather M. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16015897.(Cohen, Matthew) Modified on 7/10/2019 (kp, ). (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.M. v. Evanston Township High School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Township High School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.
Represented By: Matthew David Cohen
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Dembs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather M
Represented By: Matthew David Cohen
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Dembs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M
Represented By: Matthew David Cohen
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Dembs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?