Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 108.211.190.72
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 108.211.190.72
Case Number: 1:2019cv04647
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Pursuant to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed on 9/20/2019 #12 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC Without Prejudice (Herman, Timothy)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 9/26/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (vcf, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a rule 26(f) conference #6 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Andrew Michael Barrios (Barrios, Andrew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Herman, Timothy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Robert Herman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 7/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Herman, Timothy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Herman, Timothy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (nsf, )
July 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC of Filing FRCP 7.1 and LR 3.2 Disclosure (Herman, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Timothy Robert Herman (Herman, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herman, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16016011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 108.211.190.72
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 108.211.190.72
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Robert Herman
Represented By: Andrew Michael Barrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?