Perez v. Albany Restaurant, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Saturnino Gomez Perez
Defendant: Haiao Kao, Albany Restaurant, Inc., Peking Mandarin Restaurant and Tina Kao
Case Number: 1:2019cv04668
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #9 is granted to and including 9/27/19. Motion hearing date of 9/16/19 is stricken. Status hearing set for 9/16/19 is stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P. 16 on 10/16/19 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report. The form is accessible from the court's Internet site, https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_judges/pallmeyer/Report% 20of%20Planning%20Mtg.pdf. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Roxolana I. Harasymiw for presentment of before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/16/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Harasymiw, Roxolana)
September 2, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Albany Restaurant, Inc., Haiao Kao, Peking Mandarin Restaurant by Roxolana I. Harasymiw (Harasymiw, Roxolana)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Saturnino Gomez Perez as to Haiao Kao on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Nolan, Timothy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Saturnino Gomez Perez as to Peking Mandarin Restaurant on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Nolan, Timothy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Saturnino Gomez Perez as to Albany Restaurant, Inc. on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Nolan, Timothy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 9/16/19 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
July 11, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Albany Restaurant, Inc., Haiao Kao, Peking Mandarin Restaurant (pj, )
July 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Saturnino Gomez Perez by Timothy Michael Nolan (Nolan, Timothy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Nolan, Timothy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Saturnino Gomez Perez; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16018769. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nolan, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Albany Restaurant, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haiao Kao
Represented By: Roxolana I. Harasymiw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By: Roxolana I. Harasymiw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peking Mandarin Restaurant
Represented By: Roxolana I. Harasymiw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Kao
Represented By: Roxolana I. Harasymiw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saturnino Gomez Perez
Represented By: Timothy Michael Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?