Graphic Packaging International, LLC v. Nortech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Defendant: Nortech Packaging, LLC, Nortech, Inc., Stevan Tisma and Robert Murtagh
Case Number: 1:2019cv04675
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The docket does not reflect that summonses have been served, let alone issued. Accordingly, the status hearing set for 9/11/2019 #5 is stricken and re-set for 10/23/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff is reminded of the requirements of Civil Rule 4(m). Plaintiff has until 10/7/2019 to comply with Local Rule 83.15. Failure to comply will result in the striking of Plaintiffs pleading and the consequent dismissal of this case.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 9/11/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
July 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Graphic Packaging International, LLC by Gregory H Wagoner (Wagoner, Gregory)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wagoner, Gregory)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Monetary Relief filed by Graphic Packaging International, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16019440. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement GPI with Teshma Innovations)(Wagoner, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graphic Packaging International, LLC v. Nortech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nortech Packaging, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nortech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevan Tisma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Murtagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Represented By: Gregory H Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?