Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 108.246.71.31 and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv04686
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:For the reasons explained in the Court's order dated 8/24/15 in case number 15 C 5500, the Court grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to take early discovery #7 . No appearance on the motion is required. However, Plaintiff may not publish the identity of the Doe defendant in any way without further leave of court. Additionally, within three business days after the information requested in the subpoena is produced, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to provide the person identified by that information with a copy of this order, and a copy of the 8/24/15 order entered in case number 15 C 5500, via overnight delivery. The Doe defendant so identified shall have 30 days from the date he or she receives a copy of the orders to file an objection or other appropriate motion with this Court. The Doe defendant may proceed in this case by pseudonym (based on his or her Doe number or IP address) until further order. Mailed notice (air, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:On the Court's own motion, plaintiff's motion for leave to serve third party subpoena #7 is reset for presentment on 8/1/19 at 10:00 a.m. No appearance is required on 7/30/19. Mailed notice (air, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Order for Motion for leave to serve Third Party Subpoena by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Herman, Timothy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Robert Herman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 7/30/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Herman, Timothy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to serve Third Party Subpoena by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Notice of Filing)(Herman, Timothy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLCFor Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Herman, Timothy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Copyright Registration) (kp, )
July 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC Notice of Filing FRCP 7.1 and LR 3.2 Disclosure (Herman, Timothy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Timothy Robert Herman (Herman, Timothy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herman, Timothy)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16020575. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Robert Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 108.246.71.31
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?