USA-Halal Chamber of Commerce, Inc. v. Best Choice Meats, Inc.
Plaintiff: USA-Halal Chamber of Commerce, Inc.
Defendant: Best Choice Meats, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04693
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY by Best Choice Meats, Inc. to response in opposition to motion #26 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(McCracken, William)
August 29, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time #27 is granted. Plaintiff shall have until 9/25/2019 to post security for the injunctive relief previously granted. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas John Fox for presentment of extension of time #27 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 9/5/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Fox, Thomas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Plaintiff USA-Halal Chamber of Commerce, Inc. for extension of time to post security for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fox, Thomas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE by USA-Halal Chamber of Commerce, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Best Choice Meats, Inc. #16 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Fox, Thomas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 25 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Best Choice Meats, Inc. (Gillen, Gary)
August 14, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: Motion for TRO #5 is granted; Motion to expedite #20 is denied as moot. For the reasons stated in the order, 1) Best Choice is enjoined from using USA Halal's Crescent Moon Mark (Registration No. 4,311,881) or any mark that is in any way similar to the image of a letter "H" semi encircled by a crescent moon on any of its packaging, website, or other promotional materials. 2) Best Choice does not need to recall any products that have been sold and shipped as of August 14, 2019. 3) Best Choice may ship already packaged meat products to fill orders received as of August 14, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. but not any orders thereafter. Best Choice is ordered to submit, under seal, a listing of such orders by August 26, 2019. 4) USA Halal shall post a security in the amount of $95,000 by August 26, 2019. Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 8/14/2019. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE and Notice Regarding Lanham Act Mediation Program (Fox, Thomas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Motion hearing set for 8/15/2019 is stricken from the Court's call. Order is forthcoming. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas John Fox for presentment of motion to expedite #20 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 8/15/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Fox, Thomas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiff USA-Halal Chamber of Commerce, Inc. to expedite discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fox, Thomas)
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #16 is due by 8/26/2019; reply by 9/5/2019. Motion hearing date of 8/8/2019 is stricken. Status hearing set for 8/15/2019 is stricken and reset to 11/14/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE and Notice Regarding the Lanham Act Mediation Program by Defendant Best Choice Meats, Inc. (Gillen, Gary)
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by William E. McCracken for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #16 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 8/8/2019 at 10:30 AM. (McCracken, William)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Best Choice Meats, Inc. (McCracken, William)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff USA-Halal Chamber of Commerce, Inc. by Scott A. Browdy (Browdy, Scott)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY by Plaintiff USA-Halal Chamber of Commerce, Inc. to motion for temporary restraining order #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Notice of Filing)(Fox, Thomas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Best Choice Meats, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff USA-Halal Chamber of Commerce, Inc. for temporary restraining order Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F)(Gillen, Gary)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Best Choice Meats, Inc. by Daniel C. Roth (Roth, Daniel)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Best Choice Meats, Inc. by Elizabeth A. Sietsema (Sietsema, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Best Choice Meats, Inc. by Gary R. Gillen (Gillen, Gary)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Best Choice Meats, Inc. by William E. McCracken (McCracken, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Response to the motion for temporary restraining order #5 is due by 7/22/2019; reply by 7/25/2019. Motion hearing date of 7/18/2019 is stricken. Initial status hearing is set for 8/15/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
July 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Best Choice Meats, Inc. (acm, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (pk, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas John Fox for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #5 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 7/18/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Fox, Thomas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff USA-Halal Chamber of Commerce, Inc. for temporary restraining order Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fox, Thomas)
July 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (pk, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff USA-Halal Chamber of Commerce, Inc. by Thomas John Fox (Fox, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Fox, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by USA-Halal Chamber of Commerce, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16021680. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Fox, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA-Halal Chamber of Commerce, Inc. v. Best Choice Meats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA-Halal Chamber of Commerce, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas John Fox
Represented By: Scott A. Browdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Choice Meats, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel C. Roth
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Sietsema
Represented By: Gary R. Gillen
Represented By: William E. McCracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?