Jesse v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sanna Jesse
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04713
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Reassignment status hearing set for 9/26/19 at 10:30am in courtroom 1225. Parties are directed to review Judge Rowland's Standing Order on Cases Reassigned to Judge Mary M. Rowland, on the Court's website at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. On or before 9/19/19, counsel shall confer, prepare, and file a joint status report, not to exceed five pages. The report shall provide the information listed in the "Initial Status Report for Reassigned Case," a link to which is provided in the Standing Order on Cases Reassigned to Judge Mary M. Rowland. If a status report was previously ordered by the prior District Judge, parties may file the form of the status report previously ordered. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendant's motion to dismiss #14 and Defendant's motion to transfer venue #16 : Plaintiff's responses are due 9/25/19. Reply due on or before 10/9/19. Mailed notice. (dm, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. in support of motion to transfer case #16 venue or dismiss for forum non conveniens (Adkins, Tammy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. to transfer case venue or dismiss for forum non conveniens (Adkins, Tammy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #14 and to strike class allegations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Site Usage and Information Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Megan Winfield, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of James Smith)(Adkins, Tammy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. to dismiss and to stgrike class allegations (Adkins, Tammy)
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. (Adkins, Tammy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This case having been reassigned to the Hon. Mary M. Rowland, the 9/11/2019 status hearing before Judge Kennelly is vacated. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0024 Pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9,2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been randomly selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Mary M. Rowland's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order shall not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland for all further proceedings. Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/22/2019.(rp, )
August 11, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 9/11/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. (mk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time #7 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 9/4/2019. (mk)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Tammy L. Adkins for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Adkins, Tammy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Unopposed) (Adkins, Tammy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. by Tammy L. Adkins (Adkins, Tammy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. by David Luther Hartsell (Hartsell, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanna Jesse as to Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Sweetnam, William)
July 16, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. (yt)
July 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sanna Jesse by William M Sweetnam (Sweetnam, William)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sweetnam, William)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sanna Jesse; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16026470.(Sweetnam, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jesse v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: David Luther Hartsell
Represented By: Tammy L. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanna Jesse
Represented By: William M Sweetnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?