Szwajnos v. Crown Asset Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bogdan Szwajnos
Defendant: Crown Asset Management, LLC and Blitt and Gaines, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04714
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Blitt and Gaines, P.C.(Weller, Jennifer)
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Crown Asset Management, LLC(Weller, Jennifer)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing date of 8/13/19 #14 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants' unopposed motion for 21-day enlargement of time to file response to class action complaint #13 is granted to 8/28/19. Initial status hearing previously set for 9/4/19 is stricken and reset to 10/8/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Blitt and Gaines, P.C., Crown Asset Management, LLC (Weller, Jennifer)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer W. Weller for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/13/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Weller, Jennifer)
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants Blitt and Gaines, P.C., Crown Asset Management, LLC for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint (UNOPPOSED) (Weller, Jennifer)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Blitt and Gaines, P.C., Crown Asset Management, LLC by Jennifer W. Weller (Weller, Jennifer)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Blitt and Gaines, P.C., Crown Asset Management, LLC by David M Schultz (Schultz, David)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 9/4/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bogdan Szwajnos as to Blitt and Gaines, P.C. on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Waldera, Paul)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bogdan Szwajnos as to Crown Asset Management, LLC on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (Waldera, Paul)
July 15, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Blitt and Gaines, P.C., Crown Asset Management, LLC (lma, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
July 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bogdan Szwajnos by Paul Michael Waldera (Waldera, Paul)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bogdan Szwajnos by Cassandra P. Miller (Miller, Cassandra)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bogdan Szwajnos by Cathleen M. Combs (Combs, Cathleen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bogdan Szwajnos by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action filed by Bogdan Szwajnos; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16026567. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-C)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Szwajnos v. Crown Asset Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Asset Management, LLC
Represented By: David M Schultz
Represented By: Jennifer W. Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blitt and Gaines, P.C.
Represented By: David M Schultz
Represented By: Jennifer W. Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bogdan Szwajnos
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Paul Michael Waldera
Represented By: Cassandra P. Miller
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?