Kim v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Mi Kyung Kim and Mikyung Kim
Defendant: Acting Dir., USCIS Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Attorney General William Barr, Kenneth Cuccinelli and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv04715
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 10/10/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants William Barr, Kenneth Cuccinelli (Oswald, Craig)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants William Barr, Kenneth Cuccinelli (Treacy, Elizabeth)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants William Barr, Kenneth Cuccinelli (Oswald, Craig)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16060523. (Hwang Cho, Bonita)
July 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mi Kyung Kim by Bonita B Hwang Cho (Hwang Cho, Bonita)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hwang Cho, Bonita)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and by Mi Kyung Kim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit interview notice for N400 application, #2 Exhibit interview results, #3 Exhibit January RFE, #4 Exhibit status inquiry, #5 Exhibit April RFE, #6 Exhibit status inquiry, #7 Exhibit status inquiry, #8 Exhibit status inquiry, #9 Exhibit Congressional inquiry, #10 Exhibit status inquiry, #11 Exhibit status inquiry)(Hwang Cho, Bonita)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mi Kyung Kim
Represented By: Bonita B Hwang Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikyung Kim
Represented By: Bonita B Hwang Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Dir., USCIS Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?