Receivership Management, Inc. as Independent Fiduciary v. Assurance Plan Administrators, LLC
Plaintiff: Receivership Management, Inc. as Independent Fiduciary and Receivership Management, Inc.
Defendant: Assurance Plan Administrators, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04723
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Assurance Plan Administrators, LLC. (mc, )
August 6, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Assurance Plan Administrators, LLC (mc, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 9/26/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance Form by Receivership Management, Inc. (Pulliam, Andrew) (Docket Text modified by Clerks' Office on 7/16/2019.) (lw, ).
July 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Receivership Management, Inc. as Independent Fiduciary by Samuel G Royko (Royko, Samuel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Receivership Management, Inc. as Independent Fiduciary by Alan Francis Curley (Curley, Alan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Curley, Alan)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Receivership Management, Inc. as Independent Fiduciary; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16027400.(Curley, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Receivership Management, Inc. as Independent Fiduciary v. Assurance Plan Administrators, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurance Plan Administrators, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Receivership Management, Inc. as Independent Fiduciary
Represented By: Alan Francis Curley
Represented By: Samuel G Royko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Receivership Management, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Francis Curley
Represented By: Samuel G Royko
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?