Washington v. Hyatt Hotels Corp.
Plaintiff: Harold Brower, Eric Washington and JoAnn Couvion
Defendant: Hyatt Hotels Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04724
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion to dismiss #10 is entered and continued to 9/26/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Plaintiff is advised to review the Courts standing order on Motions to Dismiss, which is available on the Courts homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The Court's Order requires Plaintiff to make an election as to whether he will amend his complaint or stand on the current complaint and proceed with briefing on the motion to dismiss. Plaintiff shall be prepared to make an election at the 9/26/19 initial status conference/motion hearing. The 9/10/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED complaint by Eric Washington, JoAnn Couvion against Hyatt Hotels Corp. and terminating Harold Brower (individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) (Klorczyk, Frederick)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by John Fee Ward for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #10 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/10/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Ward, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by Hyatt Hotels Corp. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #10 (Ward, John)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Hyatt Hotels Corp. (Ward, John)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer #7 is granted and any answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 8/20/2019. Motion hearing set for 8/15/2019 is stricken. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 9/26/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 9/16/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by John Fee Ward for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/15/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Ward, John)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Hyatt Hotels Corp. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 / Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time For Defendant Hyatt Hotels Corporation To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint (Ward, John)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hyatt Hotels Corp. by John Fee Ward (Ward, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John Robert Blakey for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 8/5/2019. (sxb, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Harold Brower by Michael J McMorrow (McMorrow, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16094849. (Smith, Joel)
July 16, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Hyatt Hotels Corp. (yt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
July 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Harold Brower; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16027928. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klorczyk, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Hyatt Hotels Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyatt Hotels Corp.
Represented By: John Fee Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Brower
Represented By: Frederick John Klorczyk, III
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Michael J McMorrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Washington
Represented By: Frederick John Klorczyk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn Couvion
Represented By: Frederick John Klorczyk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?