Fernandez v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Fernandez
Defendant: Abbott Diabetes Care Inc. and Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04727
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dennis Fernandez (Friedman, Anthony)
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Abbott Diabetes Care Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Wickramasekera, Nimalka)
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time #14 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, August 30, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Diabetes Care Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. by Nimalka Ratnavali Wickramasekera (Wickramasekera, Nimalka)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Michael R. Rueckheim for presentment of extension of time, motion for extension of time to file answer #14 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 8/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rueckheim, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Abbott Diabetes Care Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. for extension of time , MOTION by Defendants Abbott Diabetes Care Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Rueckheim, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16179886. (Klein, Charles)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint: Before the Court is Defendants Agreed Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Court, having considered all the evidence, and finding good cause, hereby GRANTS the motion. Defendants Responsive pleadings are to be filed by September 5, 2019. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 8/9/2019: Mailed notice (pj,)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint #8 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, August 9, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Diabetes Care Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. by Dan Huy Hoang (Hoang, Dan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Michael R. Rueckheim for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 8/9/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rueckheim, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Abbott Diabetes Care Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 or Otherwise Respond (Rueckheim, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Abbott Diabetes Care Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. by Michael R. Rueckheim (Rueckheim, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Fernandez as to Abbott Diabetes Care Inc. on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Simon, Anthony)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dennis Fernandez as to Abbott Laboratories, Inc. on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Simon, Anthony)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Trademark report to Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (nsf, )
July 15, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Abbott Diabetes Care Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (lma, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dennis Fernandez by Anthony Re Friedman (Friedman, Anthony)
July 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dennis Fernandez by Anthony G. Simon (Simon, Anthony)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dennis Fernandez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16028703. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 8,374,796, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Simon, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Fernandez
Represented By: Anthony G. Simon
Represented By: Anthony Re Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Diabetes Care Inc.
Represented By: Nimalka Ratnavali Wickramasekera
Represented By: Dan Huy Hoang
Represented By: Michael R. Rueckheim
Represented By: Charles Bennett Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Nimalka Ratnavali Wickramasekera
Represented By: Dan Huy Hoang
Represented By: Michael R. Rueckheim
Represented By: Charles Bennett Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?