Luckett v. Lugsdon Tug Service
Plaintiff: Kris Luckett
Defendant: Lugsdon Tug Service
Case Number: 1:2019cv04743
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 9/4/2019. The parties are to exchange MIDP disclosures by 9/11/2019; initial written discovery requests are to be served by 9/20/2019; the deadline to amend the pleadings and join parties is 12/12/2019. Fact discovery shall close on 1/10/2020. Status hearing set for 12/3/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Service of Defendant's Mandatory Initial Discovery Disclosures by Patrick Joseph Cullinan on behalf of Lugsdon Tug Service (Cullinan, Patrick)
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lugsdon Tug Service by Adam Harold Mccabe (Mccabe, Adam)
August 27, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations (O'bryan, Sean)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kris Luckett by Sean Joseph O'bryan (O'bryan, Sean)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Kris Luckett of serving Mandatory Initial Discovery (O'Bryan, Dennis)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report of Kris Luckett and Logsdon Tug Service, Inc. by Lugsdon Tug Service (Cullinan, Patrick)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lugsdon Tug Service(Cullinan, Patrick)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Cullinan, Patrick)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lugsdon Tug Service by Patrick Joseph Cullinan (Cullinan, Patrick)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lugsdon Tug Service by John Andrew O'Donnell (O'Donnell, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lugsdon Tug Service by Steven Brian Belgrade (Belgrade, Steven)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Kris Luckett by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under MIDP Project (O'Bryan, Dennis)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 9/4/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kris Luckett by Frederic A. Mendelsohn (Mendelsohn, Frederic)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kris Luckett by Dennis M. O'Bryan for Attorney Frederic Mendelsohn (O'Bryan, Dennis)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion to appear pro hac vice by Dennis O'Bryan #3 is granted. Counsel is reminded that all attorneys appearing in this Court are required to designate local counsel pursuant to Local Rules 83.14 and 83.15. Counsel is directed to fully comply with Local Rules 83.14 and 83.15 prior to the status hearing. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16031448. (Attachments: #1 Courts in Good Standing)(O'Bryan, Dennis)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kris Luckett by Dennis M. O'Bryan (O'Bryan, Dennis)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kris Luckett; Jury Deman. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16031278. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(O'Bryan, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luckett v. Lugsdon Tug Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lugsdon Tug Service
Represented By: Steven Brian Belgrade
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Cullinan
Represented By: Adam Harold Mccabe
Represented By: John Andrew O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kris Luckett
Represented By: Dennis M. O'Bryan
Represented By: Sean Joseph O'bryan
Represented By: Frederic A. Mendelsohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?