Nape v. SeaSpine Sales LLC et al
Plaintiff: Toni Nape
Defendant: SeaSpine Orthopedics Corporation, SeaSpine Sales LLC and SeaSpine Holdings Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv04748
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 9/10/19. The parties are to exchange MIDP disclosures by 9/27/19. Initial written discovery requests are to be served by 10/11/19; the deadline to amend the pleadings and join parties is 12/18/19. Fact discovery including the deposition of treating physicians shall close on 9/3/20. Plaintiff should provide Defendant with a written demand by 10/8/19. Defendant should provide a written response by 10/29/19. Status hearing set for 12/10/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS Report INITIAL JOINT STATUS REPORT by SeaSpine Holdings Company, SeaSpine Orthopedics Corporation, SeaSpine Sales LLC (Kelly, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by SeaSpine Holdings Company, SeaSpine Orthopedics Corporation, SeaSpine Sales LLC(Kelly, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3.2 AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 STATEMENT by SeaSpine Holdings Company, SeaSpine Orthopedics Corporation, SeaSpine Sales LLC (Kelly, Matthew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 QUALIFIED HIPAA Protective Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/13/19.Mailed notice(ca, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for entry of a qualified protective order #10 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Douglas Kelly for presentment of motion for protective order #10 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/14/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Kelly, Matthew)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants SeaSpine Holdings Company, SeaSpine Orthopedics Corporation, SeaSpine Sales LLC for protective order DEFENDANTS' AGREED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Kelly, Matthew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Agreed motion for extension of time until August 19, 2019 to answer #7 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Douglas Kelly for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 7/30/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Kelly, Matthew)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants SeaSpine Holdings Company, SeaSpine Orthopedics Corporation, SeaSpine Sales LLC for extension of time DEFENDANTS' AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD (Kelly, Matthew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 9/10/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (cc, )
July 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants SeaSpine Holdings Company, SeaSpine Orthopedics Corporation, SeaSpine Sales LLC by Phillip Mark Crane (Crane, Phillip)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants SeaSpine Holdings Company, SeaSpine Orthopedics Corporation, SeaSpine Sales LLC by Matthew Douglas Kelly (Kelly, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kelly, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019L006074) filed by SeaSpine Sales LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16031967. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kelly, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nape v. SeaSpine Sales LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Nape
Represented By: Kenneth Alan Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SeaSpine Orthopedics Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Kelly
Represented By: Phillip Mark Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SeaSpine Sales LLC
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Kelly
Represented By: Phillip Mark Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SeaSpine Holdings Company
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Kelly
Represented By: Phillip Mark Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?