Burton v. York et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Burton
Defendant: City of Harvey and Jeff York
Case Number: 1:2019cv04751
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket2, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (td, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: In light of Amended General Order 20-0012 issued by Chief Judge Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020, the status hearing set for 3/17/2020 is stricken and reset to 4/14/2020 at 9:15 a.m. The Court thanks counsel in advance for adhering to these requirements as we all attempt to address the challenges posed by the COVID-19 pandemic currently confronting our country. Mailed notice (ao,)
March 13, 2020 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Status hearing set for 3/17/2020 will be conducted by telephone. Parties shall dial in using the Court's conference call-in number. The conference call-in number is 1-877-411-9748 and the passcode is 1814539. Please note that the Court's conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the Court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called by the Court. Once the Court has heard your case you shall disconnect from the conference line. BECAUSE ALL CASES SET FOR STATUS HEARINGS WILL BE USING THIS CONFERENCE CALL-IN NUMBER, PARTICIPANTS MUST REMAIN ON THE LINE WITH THE MUTE FUNCTION ACTIVATED UNTIL THEIR RESPECTIVE CASE IS CALLED. PARTICIPANTS SHALL NOT PLACE THE COURT CONFERENCE CALL ON HOLD OR ATTEMPT OTHER TELEPHONIC FUNCTIONS (E.G. ACCEPTING AN INTRAOFFICE INTERCOM COMMUNICATION, ETC.) DURING THE CONFERENCE CALL AS THIS PRACTICE OFTEN RESULTS IN UNINTENDED CONSEQUENCES SUCH AS MUSIC OR OTHER SOUNDS PROJECTING INTO THE ENTIRE CONFERENCE CALL WHILE THE ALTERNATIVE PHONE USE IS OCCURRING. The Court thanks counsel in advance for adhering to these requirements as we all attempt to address the challenges posed by the coronavirus pandemic currently confronting our country. Mailed notice (ao,)
February 21, 2020 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: Plaintiff's Joint Motion to Reschedule the Settlement Conference #28 is granted. Motion hearing set for 3/2/2020 is stricken. In light of Plaintiff's counsel's representation that he recently learned that Plaintiff received medical treatment from four, rather than two, medical facilities and that additional discovery is needed as a result, the settlement conference scheduled for 3/3/2020 is stricken. Status hearing set for 3/17/2020 at 9:15 a.m. to reschedule the settlement conference. If the parties have agreed dates for a settlement conference, they shall jointly contact Courtroom Deputy Alyssia Owens at Alyssia_Owens@ilnd.uscourts.gov, and the Court will strike the status. Mailed notice (cc, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by David Steven Lipschultz for presentment of motion to continue #28 before Honorable M. David Weisman on 3/2/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Lipschultz, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff Dawn Burton to continue and to reschedule the settlement conference (Joint Motion) (Lipschultz, David)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Magistrate status hearing held. A settlement conference is set for 3/3/20 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiff's settlement letter shall be delivered to Defendants, with a courtesy copy delivered to the Court, in chambers, on or before 2/18/20. Defendants' settlement letter shall be delivered to Plaintiff, with a courtesy copy delivered to the Court, in chambers, on or before 2/25/20. The parties must also submit their respective documents by email to Proposed_Order_Weisman@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Please note that settlement letters are not to be filed on the CM-ECF system. Parties have no objection to the Court having ex parte discussions with counsel in advance of the settlement conference if the Court believes such conversations would be warranted. (For further details see order.) Signed by the Honorable M. David Weisman on 1/9/2020. Mailed notice (ao,)
January 7, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Dawn Burton. (Lipschultz, David)
January 6, 2020 Filing 25 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY Order signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 1/6/2020. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED Certificate of Service of Defendants' Mandatory Initial Discovery Disclosures (Kunkle, Kathleen)
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service of Defendants' Mandatory Initial Discovery Disclosures (Kunkle, Kathleen)
November 4, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Weisman to conduct a settlement conference and discuss general issues related to settlement. Status hearing set for 1/9/20 at 9:15 a.m. Prior to the status hearing, the Court respectfully requests that counsel consult the Court's standing order on settlement conferences and related materials in advance of the status hearing. Judge Weisman generally conducts settlement conferences Tuesdays, Wednesdays, Thursdays, and Fridays at either 10:30 a.m. to 12:30 p.m. or 2:00 p.m. to 4:00 p.m. Other dates and times may be available as required by the Court or the parties. The Court specifically requests that counsel must have available dates for all necessary parties in advance of the status hearing, and to the extent possible, consult with opposing counsel in an attempt to identify mutually convenient and feasible dates for the settlement conference. Mailed notice (ao,)
November 1, 2019 Filing 21 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable M. David Weisman. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/1/19.(gcy, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Status hearing held. The Court adopts the report of parties planning meeting. Parties written discovery to be issued by 12/30/2019. Fact discovery ordered closed by 4/30/2020. Final supplementation of the MIDP is due 8/31/2020. Dispositive motions with supporting memoranda due by 9/30/2020. Status hearing set 4/3/2020 at 9:30 a.m. This case is referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of settlement. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 Joint Rule 26(f) Initial Planning Report by City of Harvey, Jeff York (Kunkle, Kathleen)
October 9, 2019 Filing 18 Defendants Jeff York and City of Harvey ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by City of Harvey, Jeff York(Kunkle, Kathleen)
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #15 is granted to 10/11/2019. No appearance required on 9/30/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Margaret Kunkle for presentment of extension of time #15 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kunkle, Kathleen)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendants City of Harvey, Jeff York for extension of time (Kunkle, Kathleen)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dawn Burton. All Defendants. (Lipschultz, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jeff York by Shawnte Miaundra Raines (Raines, Shawnte)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jeff York by Emanuel C. Welch (Welch, Emanuel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jeff York by Kathleen Margaret Kunkle (Kunkle, Kathleen)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jeff York by Ellen Kornichuk Emery (Emery, Ellen)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dawn Burton. City of Harvey waiver sent on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Lipschultz, David)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Harvey by Shawnte Miaundra Raines (Raines, Shawnte)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Harvey by Emanuel C. Welch (Welch, Emanuel)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Harvey by Kathleen Margaret Kunkle (Kunkle, Kathleen)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Harvey by Ellen Kornichuk Emery (Emery, Ellen)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 11/1/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report re MIDP due 10/29/2019. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
July 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dawn Burton by David Steven Lipschultz (Lipschultz, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dawn Burton; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16033060. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lipschultz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Burton
Represented By: David Steven Lipschultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Harvey
Represented By: Shawnte Miaundra Raines
Represented By: Kathleen Margaret Kunkle
Represented By: Emanuel C. Welch
Represented By: Ellen Kornichuk Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff York
Represented By: Shawnte Miaundra Raines
Represented By: Kathleen Margaret Kunkle
Represented By: Emanuel C. Welch
Represented By: Ellen Kornichuk Emery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?