United States of America, The v. Kouvelis
Plaintiff: United States of America, The
Defendant: Sophia Kouvelis
Case Number: 1:2019cv04762
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo:A notice of voluntary dismissal has been filed. Petitioner voluntarily withdraws its Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons #1 . All pending dates before this court are stricken. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America, The (Terman, Sarah)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Hearing on Petition to enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons #1 is set for 8/15/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
July 16, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (las, )
July 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Sarah Fattahi Terman as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America, The (Terman, Sarah)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Terman, Sarah)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons filed by United States of America, The; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Terman, Sarah)(Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 7/16/2019 (pk, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America, The v. Kouvelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sophia Kouvelis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America, The
Represented By: Sarah Fattahi Terman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?