De Hoyos et al v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Jose De Hoyos, Marco Gonzalez and Edward Camargo
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv04768
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Norfolk Southern Railway Company(Duffey, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16191524. (Humble, Matthew)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 8/7/2019. Mailed notice(ek, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for initial enlargement of time to respond #5 is granted. Mailed notice (ewf, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Duffey, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company by John C. Duffey (Duffey, John)
July 17, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (lw, )
July 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Edward Camargo, Jose De Hoyos, Marco Gonzalez by Jeffrey Mark Friedman (Friedman, Jeffrey)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Edward Camargo, Jose De Hoyos, Marco Gonzalez by Arijana Keserovic (Keserovic, Arijana)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jose De Hoyos, Marco Gonzalez, Edward Camargo; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16035430. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keserovic, Arijana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Hoyos et al v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: John C. Duffey
Represented By: Matthew M. Humble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose De Hoyos
Represented By: Arijana Keserovic
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Gonzalez
Represented By: Arijana Keserovic
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Camargo
Represented By: Arijana Keserovic
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?