Sefkow et al v. American Airlines et al
Plaintiff: Adam Sefkow and Elizabeth Sefkow
Defendant: Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA INC., Envoy Air, Inc.,, Inc American Airlines, Bombardier, Inc. and American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04770
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION by Plaintiffs Adam Sefkow, Elizabeth Sefkow for order Agreed Confidentiality Order (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Agreed Confidentiality Order)(Cameron, Chester)
March 6, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE by American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air, Inc., re answer to complaint #58 (Sidkey, Robert)
March 6, 2020 Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint 4th Amended Complaint At Law by American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air, Inc.,(Sidkey, Robert)
February 19, 2020 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of Service Plaintiffs' Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production by Chester L Cameron, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cameron, Chester)
February 13, 2020 Filing 56 4TH AMENDED complaint by Elizabeth Sefkow, Adam Sefkow against All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Murray, Sean)
February 6, 2020 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 2/6/2020 with attorneys for all parties. Plaintiff has leave to file amended complaint by 2/13/2020; defendants' prior answer will stand as to the amended complaint unless they wish to file a new answer. Status hearing is continued to 4/14/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (mma, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendants American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air, Inc., (Sidkey, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Filing 53 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 12/2/2019 with attorneys for all parties. Status hearing is continued to 2/6/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (mma, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE of Service Plaintiffs Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures to Defendant, Safran Seats, USA, LLC f/k/a/ Zodiac Aerospace by Chester L Cameron, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cameron, Chester)
November 26, 2019 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE of Safran Seats USA LLC Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) (Alexander, Azar)
November 26, 2019 Filing 50 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Safran Seats USA, LLC (Alexander, Azar)
November 13, 2019 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint by Safran Seats USA, LLC(Alexander, Azar)
November 6, 2019 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Because the Court has already set a discovery schedule, the portion of yesterday's order #46 that directs the parties to discuss and attempt to agree upon a discovery schedule is vacated as unnecessary. (mk)
November 6, 2019 Filing 47 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air, Inc., by Courtney Elizabeth Lindbert Appearance - CEL (Lindbert, Courtney)
November 5, 2019 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 11/5/2019. Plaintiff's claims against Bombardier, Inc. are voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Bombardier Inc.'s motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #43 is terminated as moot. Rule 26(a) disclosures are to be made by 11/26/2019. The parties are directed to discuss and attempt to agree upon a discovery schedule. Status hearing set for 11/13/2019 is vacated and reset to 12/2/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (mma, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 45 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Bombardier, Inc. BOMBARDIER INC.'S CORPORATION DISCLOSURE (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing and Certificate of Service)(Schneider, Linda)
October 29, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion by Linda J. Schneider for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #43 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/5/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Schneider, Linda)
October 29, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION by Defendant Bombardier, Inc. to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction BOMBARDIER INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schneider, Linda)
October 29, 2019 Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bombardier, Inc. by Linda J. Schneider (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing and Certificate of Service)(Schneider, Linda)
October 29, 2019 Filing 41 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bombardier, Inc. by Donald G. Machalinski (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing and Certificate of Service)(Machalinski, Donald)
October 29, 2019 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant Safron Seats USA, LLC's unopposed motion to extend time #37 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 11/13/2019. (mk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Safran Seats USA, LLC by Jeffrey W. Morof (Morof, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Motion by Azar Alexander for presentment of extension of time #37 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/31/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Alexander, Azar)
October 22, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION by Defendant Safran Seats USA, LLC for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Unopposed) (Alexander, Azar)
October 22, 2019 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Safran Seats USA, LLC by Azar Alexander (Alexander, Azar)
October 18, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air, Inc., for Answer to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint (Sidkey, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to amended complaint by American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air, Inc.,(Sidkey, Robert)
October 7, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS returned executed as to Safran Seats USA, LLC Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Cameron, Chester) Modified on 10/8/2019 (bg, ).
October 3, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Safran Seats USA, LLC (ecw, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 32 3rd AMENDED complaint by Adam Sefkow, Elizabeth Sefkow against All Defendants (Cameron, Chester)
September 23, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 9/23/2019. Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #18 is terminated as moot. Plaintiff has leave to file an amended complaint naming a new defendant by 9/27/2019 with summons to issue to the newly named defendant. Deadline for amending pleadings and adding parties is 6/30/2020. Fact discovery including treating personnel is to be completed by 9/30/2020. Status hearing set for 11/13/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Service of Plaintiffs' Initial 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Chester L Cameron, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cameron, Chester)
September 16, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of Service by Robert Emin Sidkey on behalf of American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air, Inc., (Sidkey, Robert)
September 15, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, because it will not be holding a 9:00 AM call on 9/18/2019, the status hearing set for that date is reset to 9/23/2019 at 9:30 AM. (mk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air, Inc., re answer to complaint #26 (Sidkey, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Filing 26 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air, Inc.,(Sidkey, Robert)
September 6, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Bombardier, Inc. (mc, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 9/18/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. (mk)
August 21, 2019 Filing 23 Second AMENDED complaint by Adam Sefkow, Elizabeth Sefkow against Bombardier, Inc. and terminating Bombardier Aerospace Corporation (f/k/a Canadair Challenger, Inc.) and Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA INC. (Cameron, Chester)
August 20, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 8/20/2019. Motion to amend/correct #20 is granted; plaintiff has leave to file a second amended complaint. Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 9/18/2019, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Motion by Chester L Cameron, Jr for presentment of motion to amend/correct #20 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/20/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Cameron, Chester)
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiffs Adam Sefkow, Elizabeth Sefkow to amend/correct Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Exhibit)(Cameron, Chester)
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Linda J. Schneider for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, #18 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 8/20/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Schneider, Linda)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendants Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA INC., Bombardier Aerospace Corporation to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction BOMBARDIER AEROSPACE CORPORATION AND BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION (HOLDINGS) USA INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Souders Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - Sjogren Affidavit)(Schneider, Linda)
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 MAIL RETURNED, for document #16 sent to Maureen Elizabeth Napleton returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received. (mc, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Bombardier defendants' unopposed motion for enlargement of time #14 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 8/6/2019. (mk)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #12 #13 #14 #15 sent to Attorney Maureen Elizabeth Napleton returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Maureen Elizabeth Napleton a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (mc, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Linda J. Schneider for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #14 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Schneider, Linda)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA INC. for extension of time to file answer DEFENDANTS, BOMBARDIER AEROSPACE CORP. AND BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION (HOLDINGS) USA INC., UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AT LAW (Schneider, Linda)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air, Inc., re answer to complaint #12 (Sidkey, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Airlines, Inc., Envoy Air, Inc.,(Sidkey, Robert)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Adam Sefkow, Elizabeth Sefkow by Chester L Cameron, Jr (Cameron, Chester)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Inc American Airlines, Envoy Air, Inc., by Maureen Elizabeth Napleton (Napleton, Maureen)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA INC. (Schneider, Linda)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Bombardier Aerospace Corporation (Schneider, Linda)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA INC. by Linda J. Schneider (Schneider, Linda)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA INC. by Donald G. Machalinski (Machalinski, Donald)
July 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Inc American Airlines, Envoy Air, Inc., (Sidkey, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Inc American Airlines, Envoy Air, Inc., by Robert Emin Sidkey (Sidkey, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sidkey, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019 L 006271) filed by Inc American Airlines, Bombardier Aerospace Corporation, Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA INC., Envoy Air, Inc., Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16035833. (Sidkey, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sefkow et al v. American Airlines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Sefkow
Represented By: Chester L Cameron, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Sefkow
Represented By: Chester L Cameron, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Aerospace Corporation
Represented By: Linda J. Schneider
Represented By: Donald G. Machalinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier Transportation (Holdings) USA INC.
Represented By: Linda J. Schneider
Represented By: Donald G. Machalinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envoy Air, Inc.,
Represented By: Robert Emin Sidkey
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth Napleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc American Airlines
Represented By: Robert Emin Sidkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bombardier, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Emin Sidkey
Represented By: Maureen Elizabeth Napleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?