Gale et al v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eileen Gale and Michael Gale
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04779
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Pursuant to stipulation of voluntary dismissal, this case is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). All pending dates and motions are terminated as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Geller, Jeremy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re attorney appearance #10 (Geller, Jeremy)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Eileen Gale, Michael Gale by Jeremy L. Geller (Geller, Jeremy)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report re MIDP due 10/7/2019. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel, Michael Kopsick. (jh, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Malaty, Danielle)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Eileen Gale, Michael Gale by Michael Kopsick (Kopsick, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Eileen Gale, Michael Gale by Michael Kopsick (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing - Attorney Appearance)(Kopsick, Michael)
July 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. by Danielle N Malaty (Malaty, Danielle)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Malaty, Danielle)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019 L 006817) filed by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16036805. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Malaty, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gale et al v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle N Malaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Gale
Represented By: Michael Kopsick
Represented By: Jeremy L. Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gale
Represented By: Michael Kopsick
Represented By: Jeremy L. Geller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?